This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/25/2023 at 00:40:43 (UTC).

TD BANK USA, N.A. VS MARLENE D ROMERO

Case Summary

On 04/18/2022 TD BANK USA, N A filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against MARLENE D ROMERO. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Chatsworth Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is KAREN MOSKOWITZ. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******8243

  • Filing Date:

    04/18/2022

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

KAREN MOSKOWITZ

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TD BANK USA N.A.

Defendant

ROMERO MARLENE D

Reseda, CA 91335

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

AGUIRRE NATHALIA A

 

Court Documents

Proof of Service by Mail - Proof of Service by Mail

3/8/2023: Proof of Service by Mail - Proof of Service by Mail

Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

3/8/2023: Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

Proof of Service by Mail - Proof of Service by Mail

2/23/2023: Proof of Service by Mail - Proof of Service by Mail

Notice (name extension) - Notice in lieu of subpoena

2/23/2023: Notice (name extension) - Notice in lieu of subpoena

Proof of Service - Order Granting Attorney's Motion to be Relieved as Counsel - Proof of Service - Order Granting Attorney's Motion to be Relieved as Counsel

1/4/2023: Proof of Service - Order Granting Attorney's Motion to be Relieved as Counsel - Proof of Service - Order Granting Attorney's Motion to be Relieved as Counsel

Notice of Ruling - Notice of Ruling

12/29/2022: Notice of Ruling - Notice of Ruling

Order Granting Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil - Order Granting Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil

12/28/2022: Order Granting Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil - Order Granting Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil

Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to be Relieved as Counsel)

12/28/2022: Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to be Relieved as Counsel)

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) - Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

10/25/2022: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) - Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel - Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel

10/25/2022: Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel - Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel

Declaration in Support of Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil - Declaration in Support of Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil

10/25/2022: Declaration in Support of Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil - Declaration in Support of Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil

Answer - Answer

6/15/2022: Answer - Answer

Notice of Trial - Notice of Trial

6/15/2022: Notice of Trial - Notice of Trial

Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

5/20/2022: Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

Complaint - Complaint

4/18/2022: Complaint - Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

4/18/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - Summons on Complaint

4/18/2022: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

4/18/2022: Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/08/2023
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail; Filed by: TD BANK USA, N.A. (Plaintiff); As to: MARLENE D ROMERO (Defendant); After Substituted Service of Summons and Complaint ?: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/08/2023
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by TD BANK USA, N.A. on 04/18/2022, entered Request for Dismissal without prejudice filed by TD BANK USA, N.A. as to the entire action

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/08/2023
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by: TD BANK USA, N.A. (Plaintiff); As to: MARLENE D ROMERO (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/08/2023
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 04/24/2023 at 08:30 AM in Chatsworth Courthouse at Department F43 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 03/08/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • DocketNotice in lieu of subpoena; Filed by: TD BANK USA, N.A. (Plaintiff); As to: MARLENE D ROMERO (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail; Filed by: TD BANK USA, N.A. (Plaintiff); As to: MARLENE D ROMERO (Defendant); After Substituted Service of Summons and Complaint ?: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2023
  • DocketUpdated -- Order Granting Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil: Filed By: Tyneia Merritt (Attorney); Result: Granted ; Result Date: 01/04/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2023
  • DocketProof of Service - Order Granting Attorney's Motion to be Relieved as Counsel; Filed by: Tyneia Merritt (Attorney); As to: TD BANK USA, N.A. (Plaintiff); MARLENE D ROMERO (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2022
  • DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by: MARLENE D ROMERO (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel: Filed By: Tyneia Merritt (Attorney); Result: Granted ; Result Date: 12/28/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 06/15/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- Event scheduled for 04/24/2023 at 08:30 AM in Chatsworth Courthouse at Department F43 Type changed from Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 to Non-Jury Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: TD BANK USA, N.A. (Plaintiff); As to: MARLENE D ROMERO (Defendant); Service Date: 05/18/2022; Service Cost: 89.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/18/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: TD BANK USA, N.A. (Plaintiff); As to: MARLENE D ROMERO (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/18/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: TD BANK USA, N.A. (Plaintiff); As to: MARLENE D ROMERO (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/18/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: TD BANK USA, N.A. (Plaintiff); As to: MARLENE D ROMERO (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/18/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740); Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/18/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/18/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 scheduled for 04/24/2023 at 08:30 AM in Chatsworth Courthouse at Department F43

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/18/2022
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Collections Case (CCP 3.740)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/18/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Karen Moskowitz in Department F43 Chatsworth Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less