Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/12/2021 at 05:12:24 (UTC).

TD BANK USA, N.A. VS MARIA CISNEROS

Case Summary

On 03/29/2021 TD BANK USA, N A filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against MARIA CISNEROS. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Norwalk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is ANDREW C. KIM. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2363

  • Filing Date:

    03/29/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Norwalk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

ANDREW C. KIM

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TD BANK USA N.A.

Defendant

CISNEROS MARIA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SIDUGUEN CHRISTINE

 

Court Documents

Judgment - Judgment Judgment

6/24/2021: Judgment - Judgment Judgment

Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

6/24/2021: Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

Declaration (name extension) - Declaration Attorney declaration

6/24/2021: Declaration (name extension) - Declaration Attorney declaration

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

6/24/2021: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Declaration (name extension) - Declaration of Non-Service

4/26/2021: Declaration (name extension) - Declaration of Non-Service

Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

4/30/2021: Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

Complaint - Complaint

3/29/2021: Complaint - Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

3/29/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - Summons on Complaint

3/29/2021: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

3/29/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

3/29/2021: Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/24/2021
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by: TD Bank USA, N.A. (Plaintiff); As to: MARIA CISNEROS (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • DocketDeclaration Attorney declaration; Filed by: TD Bank USA, N.A. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • DocketJudgment Judgment; Filed by: TD Bank USA, N.A. (Plaintiff); As to: MARIA CISNEROS (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • DocketDefault entered as to MARIA CISNEROS; On the Complaint filed by TD Bank USA, N.A. on 03/29/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • DocketDefault judgment by Clerk entered for Plaintiff TD Bank USA, N.A. against Defendant MARIA CISNEROS on the Complaint filed by TD Bank USA, N.A. on 03/29/2021 for the principal amount of $1,654.26 and costs of $327.90 for a total of $1,982.16.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by TD Bank USA, N.A. on 03/29/2021, entered Request for Dismissal without prejudice filed by TD Bank USA, N.A., does 1 THROUGH 10

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 scheduled for 04/04/2022 at 08:30 AM in Norwalk Courthouse at Department A Not Held - Vacated by Court on 06/24/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: TD Bank USA, N.A. (Plaintiff); As to: MARIA CISNEROS (Defendant); Service Date: 04/30/2021; Service Cost: 85.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • DocketDeclaration of Non-Service; Filed by: TD Bank USA, N.A. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 scheduled for 04/04/2022 at 08:30 AM in Norwalk Courthouse at Department A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Andrew C. Kim in Department A Norwalk Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Collections Case (CCP 3.740)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: TD Bank USA, N.A. (Plaintiff); As to: MARIA CISNEROS (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: TD Bank USA, N.A. (Plaintiff); As to: MARIA CISNEROS (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: TD Bank USA, N.A. (Plaintiff); As to: MARIA CISNEROS (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where TD Bank, NA is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Siduguen, Christine S.