This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/09/2021 at 12:49:13 (UTC).

TD BANK USA, N.A. VS CLAUDIA VARGASTEPEZANO

Case Summary

On 07/08/2021 TD BANK USA, N A filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against CLAUDIA VARGASTEPEZANO. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Norwalk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is SCOTT R. HERIN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5933

  • Filing Date:

    07/08/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Courthouse:

    Norwalk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

SCOTT R. HERIN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TD BANK USA N.A.

Defendant

VARGASTEPEZANO CLAUDIA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KARKOON ANNA C

 

Court Documents

Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court) - Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

8/16/2021: Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court) - Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

Answer - Answer

8/16/2021: Answer - Answer

Proof of Service by Mail - Proof of Service by Mail

8/23/2021: Proof of Service by Mail - Proof of Service by Mail

Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

7/19/2021: Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

7/8/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint - Complaint

7/8/2021: Complaint - Complaint

Summons - Summons on Complaint

7/8/2021: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

7/8/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

7/8/2021: Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/14/2022
  • Hearing07/14/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department A at 12720 Norwalk Blvd., Norwalk, CA 90650; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail; Filed by: CLAUDIA VARGASTEPEZANO (Defendant); As to: TD Bank USA, N.A. (Plaintiff); After Substituted Service of Summons & Complaint ?: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: CLAUDIA VARGASTEPEZANO (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2021
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees; Filed by: CLAUDIA VARGASTEPEZANO (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2021
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Signed and Filed by: Clerk; As to: CLAUDIA VARGASTEPEZANO (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2021
  • DocketUpdated -- Event scheduled for 07/14/2022 at 08:30 AM in Norwalk Courthouse at Department A Type changed from Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 to Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: TD Bank USA, N.A. (Plaintiff); As to: CLAUDIA VARGASTEPEZANO (Defendant); Service Date: 07/16/2021; Service Cost: 85.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 scheduled for 07/14/2022 at 08:30 AM in Norwalk Courthouse at Department A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Scott R. Herin in Department A Norwalk Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: TD Bank USA, N.A. (Plaintiff); As to: CLAUDIA VARGASTEPEZANO (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: TD Bank USA, N.A. (Plaintiff); As to: CLAUDIA VARGASTEPEZANO (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: TD Bank USA, N.A. (Plaintiff); As to: CLAUDIA VARGASTEPEZANO (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Collections Case (CCP 3.740)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where TD Bank, NA is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer KARKOON ANNA C