Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/17/2021 at 12:07:59 (UTC).

TD BANK USA, N.A. VS BIANCA GURROLA

Case Summary

On 04/23/2021 TD BANK USA, N A filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against BIANCA GURROLA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Norwalk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MARIA ANDREA DAVALOS. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6763

  • Filing Date:

    04/23/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Norwalk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

MARIA ANDREA DAVALOS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TD BANK USA N.A.

Defendant

GURROLA BIANCA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WRIGHT ROBERT W.

Defendant Attorney

JACOBS LYNDA E.

 

Court Documents

Answer - Answer

5/28/2021: Answer - Answer

Proof of Service by Mail - Proof of Service by Mail

5/28/2021: Proof of Service by Mail - Proof of Service by Mail

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

5/18/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

4/23/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Summons - Summons on Complaint

4/23/2021: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

4/23/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

4/23/2021: Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

Complaint - Complaint

4/23/2021: Complaint - Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/29/2022
  • Hearing04/29/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department A at 12720 Norwalk Blvd., Norwalk, CA 90650; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: BIANCA GURROLA (Defendant); As to: TD Bank USA, N.A. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail; Filed by: BIANCA GURROLA (Defendant); As to: TD Bank USA, N.A. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • DocketUpdated -- Event scheduled for 04/29/2022 at 08:30 AM in Norwalk Courthouse at Department A Type changed from Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 to Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: TD Bank USA, N.A. (Plaintiff); As to: BIANCA GURROLA (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 05/17/2021; Service Cost: 85.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 scheduled for 04/29/2022 at 08:30 AM in Norwalk Courthouse at Department A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Maria Andrea Davalos in Department A Norwalk Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: TD Bank USA, N.A. (Plaintiff); As to: BIANCA GURROLA (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2021
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: TD Bank USA, N.A. (Plaintiff); As to: BIANCA GURROLA (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: TD Bank USA, N.A. (Plaintiff); As to: BIANCA GURROLA (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2021
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Collections Case (CCP 3.740)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where TD Bank, NA is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer WRIGHT ROBERT W.