Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/27/2021 at 07:11:50 (UTC).

TD BANK USA, N.A. AS SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO TARGET NATIONAL BANK VS MARICELA GARCIA

Case Summary

On 02/16/2021 TD BANK USA, N A AS SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO TARGET NATIONAL BANK filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against MARICELA GARCIA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Norwalk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is ANDREW C. KIM. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5476

  • Filing Date:

    02/16/2021

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Norwalk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

ANDREW C. KIM

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TD BANK USA N.A. AS SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO TARGET NATIONAL BANK

Defendant

GARCIA MARICELA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SIDUGUEN CHRISTINE

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

3/24/2021: Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

2/23/2021: Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

Complaint - Complaint

2/16/2021: Complaint - Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

2/16/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

2/16/2021: Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

Summons - Summons on Complaint

2/16/2021: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

2/16/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/24/2021
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by TD Bank USA, N.A. as successor in interest to TARGET NATIONAL BANK on 02/16/2021, entered Request for Dismissal with prejudice filed by TD Bank USA, N.A. as successor in interest to TARGET NATIONAL BANK as to the entire action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 scheduled for 02/22/2022 at 08:30 AM in Norwalk Courthouse at Department A Not Held - Vacated by Court on 03/24/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: TD Bank USA, N.A. as successor in interest to TARGET NATIONAL BANK (Plaintiff); As to: MARICELA GARCIA (Defendant); Service Date: 02/21/2021; Service Cost: 85.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 scheduled for 02/22/2022 at 08:30 AM in Norwalk Courthouse at Department A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Andrew C. Kim in Department A Norwalk Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: TD Bank USA, N.A. as successor in interest to TARGET NATIONAL BANK (Plaintiff); As to: MARICELA GARCIA (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: TD Bank USA, N.A. as successor in interest to TARGET NATIONAL BANK (Plaintiff); As to: MARICELA GARCIA (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: TD Bank USA, N.A. as successor in interest to TARGET NATIONAL BANK (Plaintiff); As to: MARICELA GARCIA (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Collections Case (CCP 3.740)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where TD Bank, NA is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Siduguen, Christine S.