Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/25/2021 at 07:06:50 (UTC).

TD BANK USA, N.A. AS SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO TARGET NATIONAL BANK VS DOROTHY A CURRIE

Case Summary

On 02/16/2021 TD BANK USA, N A AS SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO TARGET NATIONAL BANK filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against DOROTHY A CURRIE. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Norwalk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is ANDREW C. KIM. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5478

  • Filing Date:

    02/16/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Norwalk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

ANDREW C. KIM

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TD BANK USA N.A. AS SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO TARGET NATIONAL BANK

Defendant

CURRIE DOROTHY A

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SIDUGUEN CHRISTINE

 

Court Documents

Declaration (name extension) - Declaration of Non-Service of Summons/Complaint

2/24/2021: Declaration (name extension) - Declaration of Non-Service of Summons/Complaint

Summons - Summons on Complaint

2/16/2021: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

2/16/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

2/16/2021: Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

Complaint - Complaint

2/16/2021: Complaint - Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

2/16/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/22/2022
  • Hearing02/22/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department A at 12720 Norwalk Blvd., Norwalk, CA 90650; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • DocketDeclaration of Non-Service of Summons/Complaint; Filed by: TD Bank USA, N.A. as successor in interest to TARGET NATIONAL BANK (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 scheduled for 02/22/2022 at 08:30 AM in Norwalk Courthouse at Department A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Andrew C. Kim in Department A Norwalk Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: TD Bank USA, N.A. as successor in interest to TARGET NATIONAL BANK (Plaintiff); As to: DOROTHY A CURRIE (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: TD Bank USA, N.A. as successor in interest to TARGET NATIONAL BANK (Plaintiff); As to: DOROTHY A CURRIE (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: TD Bank USA, N.A. as successor in interest to TARGET NATIONAL BANK (Plaintiff); As to: DOROTHY A CURRIE (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Collections Case (CCP 3.740)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where TD Bank, NA is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Siduguen, Christine S.