Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/07/2021 at 04:42:33 (UTC).

TD BANK USA, N.A., AS SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO TARGET NATIONAL BANK VS ANTHONY L BRADLEY

Case Summary

On 03/15/2021 TD BANK USA, N A , AS SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO TARGET NATIONAL BANK filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against ANTHONY L BRADLEY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Norwalk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is ANDREW C. KIM. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******9623

  • Filing Date:

    03/15/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Norwalk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

ANDREW C. KIM

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TD BANK USA N.A. AS SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO TARGET NATIONAL BANK

Defendant

BRADLEY ANTHONY L

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WRIGHT ROBERT W.

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

5/25/2021: Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

5/25/2021: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Declaration (name extension) - Declaration FOR REIMBURSEMENT OF COSTS [C.C.P. 1033]

5/25/2021: Declaration (name extension) - Declaration FOR REIMBURSEMENT OF COSTS [C.C.P. 1033]

Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment - Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment

5/25/2021: Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment - Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment

Judgment - Judgment Judgment

5/26/2021: Judgment - Judgment Judgment

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

4/5/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Complaint - Complaint

3/15/2021: Complaint - Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

3/15/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - Summons on Complaint

3/15/2021: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

3/15/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

3/15/2021: Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/26/2021
  • DocketUpdated -- Judgment: Name Extension: blank; As To Parties changed from ANTHONY L BRADLEY (Defendant) to ANTHONY L BRADLEY (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • DocketJudgment Judgment; Filed by: TD Bank USA, N.A., as successor in interest to Target National Bank (Plaintiff); As to: ANTHONY L BRADLEY (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • DocketDefault judgment by Clerk entered for Plaintiff TD Bank USA, N.A., as successor in interest to Target National Bank against Defendant ANTHONY L BRADLEY on the Complaint filed by TD Bank USA, N.A., as successor in interest to Target National Bank on 03/15/2021 for the principal amount of $2,995.06 and costs of $379.00 for a total of $3,374.06.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by TD Bank USA, N.A., as successor in interest to Target National Bank on 03/15/2021, entered Request for Dismissal without prejudice filed by TD Bank USA, N.A., as successor in interest to Target National Bank, does 1 -15, INCLUSIVE ONLY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 scheduled for 03/21/2022 at 08:30 AM in Norwalk Courthouse at Department A Not Held - Vacated by Court on 05/26/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by: TD Bank USA, N.A., as successor in interest to Target National Bank (Plaintiff); As to: ANTHONY L BRADLEY (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • DocketDeclaration FOR REIMBURSEMENT OF COSTS [C.C.P. 1033]; Filed by: TD Bank USA, N.A., as successor in interest to Target National Bank (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • DocketDeclaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment; Filed by: TD Bank USA, N.A., as successor in interest to Target National Bank (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • DocketDefault entered as to ANTHONY L BRADLEY; On the Complaint filed by TD Bank USA, N.A., as successor in interest to Target National Bank on 03/15/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: TD Bank USA, N.A., as successor in interest to Target National Bank (Plaintiff); As to: ANTHONY L BRADLEY (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 03/30/2021; Service Cost: 85.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 scheduled for 03/21/2022 at 08:30 AM in Norwalk Courthouse at Department A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Andrew C. Kim in Department A Norwalk Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: TD Bank USA, N.A., as successor in interest to Target National Bank (Plaintiff); As to: ANTHONY L BRADLEY (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: TD Bank USA, N.A., as successor in interest to Target National Bank (Plaintiff); As to: ANTHONY L BRADLEY (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: TD Bank USA, N.A., as successor in interest to Target National Bank (Plaintiff); As to: ANTHONY L BRADLEY (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Collections Case (CCP 3.740)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where TD Bank, NA is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer WRIGHT ROBERT W.