This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/15/2022 at 14:25:37 (UTC).

TBF FINANCIAL I, LLC, A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY VS RONALD FLYNN TAYLOR, AN INDIVIDUAL, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 06/16/2022 TBF FINANCIAL I, LLC, A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against RONALD FLYNN TAYLOR, AN INDIVIDUAL,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Norwalk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MARIA ANDREA DAVALOS. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3538

  • Filing Date:

    06/16/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

MARIA ANDREA DAVALOS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TBF FINANCIAL I LLC A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Defendants

TAYLOR AN INDIVIDUAL RONALD FLYNN

DOES 1 THROUGH 10 INCLUSIVE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

COLLINSON LISA DAWN

 

Court Documents

Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

6/16/2022: Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

6/16/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Complaint - Complaint

6/16/2022: Complaint - Complaint

Summons - Summons on Complaint

6/16/2022: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

6/16/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

8/18/2022: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

8/5/2022: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/22/2023
  • Hearing06/22/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department A at 12720 Norwalk Blvd., Norwalk, CA 90650; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/18/2022
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by: TBF FINANCIAL I, LLC, a Limited Liability Company (Plaintiff); As to: RONALD FLYNN TAYLOR, an individual (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/18/2022
  • DocketDefault entered as to RONALD FLYNN TAYLOR, an individual; On the Complaint filed by TBF FINANCIAL I, LLC, a Limited Liability Company on 06/16/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/05/2022
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: TBF FINANCIAL I, LLC, a Limited Liability Company (Plaintiff); As to: RONALD FLYNN TAYLOR, an individual (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 07/07/2022; Service Cost: 100.30; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 scheduled for 06/22/2023 at 08:30 AM in Norwalk Courthouse at Department A

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Maria Andrea Davalos in Department A Norwalk Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/16/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: TBF FINANCIAL I, LLC, a Limited Liability Company (Plaintiff); As to: RONALD FLYNN TAYLOR, an individual (Defendant); DOES 1 through 10, inclusive (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/16/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: TBF FINANCIAL I, LLC, a Limited Liability Company (Plaintiff); As to: RONALD FLYNN TAYLOR, an individual (Defendant); DOES 1 through 10, inclusive (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/16/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: TBF FINANCIAL I, LLC, a Limited Liability Company (Plaintiff); As to: RONALD FLYNN TAYLOR, an individual (Defendant); DOES 1 through 10, inclusive (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/16/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740); Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/16/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/16/2022
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Collections Case (CCP 3.740)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where TBF FINANCIAL I LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer COLLINSON LISA D. ESQ.