This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/30/2023 at 07:36:44 (UTC).

TAPIA ENTERPRISES, INC., A CORPORATION VS WAKY BURRO LLC, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 10/21/2022 TAPIA ENTERPRISES, INC , A CORPORATION filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against WAKY BURRO LLC,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Norwalk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MARIA ANDREA DAVALOS. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5052

  • Filing Date:

    10/21/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

MARIA ANDREA DAVALOS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TAPIA ENTERPRISES INC. A CORPORATION DBA TAPIA BROTHERS COMPANY

Defendants

WAKY BURRO LLC DBA WAKY BURRO AKA BLUE BURRO #2

LEON KARLA CRUZ AN INDIVIDUAL AKA KARLA Y LEON

CRUZ WILLIAM AN INDIVIDUAL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SHERMAN GARY S

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

10/21/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Summons - Summons on Complaint

10/21/2022: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Complaint - Complaint

10/21/2022: Complaint - Complaint

Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

10/21/2022: Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

10/21/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Proof of Service - No Service - Proof of Service - No Service

11/10/2022: Proof of Service - No Service - Proof of Service - No Service

Proof of Service - No Service - Proof of Service - No Service

11/10/2022: Proof of Service - No Service - Proof of Service - No Service

Proof of Service - No Service - Proof of Service - No Service

11/10/2022: Proof of Service - No Service - Proof of Service - No Service

Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

12/19/2022: Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

12/19/2022: Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

12/19/2022: Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

Declaration of Interest, Costs and Attorney Fees - Declaration of Interest, Costs and Attorney Fees

12/20/2022: Declaration of Interest, Costs and Attorney Fees - Declaration of Interest, Costs and Attorney Fees

Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment - Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment

12/20/2022: Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment - Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

12/20/2022: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Request (name extension) - Request Request for Dismissal of Does 1 through 20

12/20/2022: Request (name extension) - Request Request for Dismissal of Does 1 through 20

Default Judgment - Default Judgment

12/30/2022: Default Judgment - Default Judgment

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/05/2023
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 scheduled for 10/27/2023 at 08:30 AM in Norwalk Courthouse at Department Y Not Held - Vacated by Court on 01/05/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2022
  • DocketDefault judgment by Court entered for Plaintiff Tapia Enterprises, Inc., a corporation DBA Tapia Brothers Company against Defendant Waky Burro LLC AKA Blue Burro #2, DBA Waky Burro, Defendant Karla Cruz Leon an individual AKA Karla Y Leon and Defendant William Cruz an individual on the Complaint filed by Tapia Enterprises, Inc., a corporation on 10/21/2022 for the principal amount of $9,812.17, attorney fees of $678.73, interest of $462.38, and costs of $525.00 for a total of $11,478.28.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2022
  • DocketDefault Judgment; Signed and Filed by: Tapia Enterprises, Inc., a corporation (Plaintiff); As to: Waky Burro LLC (Defendant); Karla Cruz Leon, an individual (Defendant); William Cruz, an individual (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- Default Judgment: Filed By: Tapia Enterprises, Inc., a corporation (Plaintiff); Result: Granted ; Result Date: 12/30/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2022
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by: Tapia Enterprises, Inc., a corporation (Plaintiff); As to: Waky Burro LLC (Defendant); Karla Cruz Leon, an individual (Defendant); William Cruz, an individual (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2022
  • DocketDeclaration of Interest, Costs and Attorney Fees; Filed by: Tapia Enterprises, Inc., a corporation (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2022
  • DocketDeclaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment; Filed by: Tapia Enterprises, Inc., a corporation (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2022
  • DocketDefault entered as to Waky Burro LLC; Karla Cruz Leon, an individual; William Cruz, an individual; On the Complaint filed by Tapia Enterprises, Inc., a corporation on 10/21/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2022
  • DocketRequest Request for Dismissal of Does 1 through 20; Filed by: Tapia Enterprises, Inc., a corporation (Plaintiff); Charge Fee ?: YES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2022
  • DocketDefault Judgment; Proposed - Received by: Tapia Enterprises, Inc., a corporation (Plaintiff); As to: Waky Burro LLC (Defendant); Karla Cruz Leon, an individual (Defendant); William Cruz, an individual (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 11/10/2022
  • DocketProof of Service - No Service; Filed by: Tapia Enterprises, Inc., a corporation (Plaintiff); As to: Karla Cruz Leon, an individual (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2022
  • DocketProof of Service - No Service; Filed by: Tapia Enterprises, Inc., a corporation (Plaintiff); As to: Waky Burro LLC (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/24/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 scheduled for 10/27/2023 at 08:30 AM in Norwalk Courthouse at Department A

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/24/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Maria Andrea Davalos in Department A Norwalk Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/21/2022
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Collections Case (CCP 3.740)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/21/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Tapia Enterprises, Inc., a corporation (Plaintiff); As to: Waky Burro LLC (Defendant); Karla Cruz Leon, an individual (Defendant); William Cruz, an individual (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/21/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Tapia Enterprises, Inc., a corporation (Plaintiff); As to: Waky Burro LLC (Defendant); Karla Cruz Leon, an individual (Defendant); William Cruz, an individual (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/21/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Tapia Enterprises, Inc., a corporation (Plaintiff); As to: Waky Burro LLC (Defendant); Karla Cruz Leon, an individual (Defendant); William Cruz, an individual (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/21/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740); Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/21/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less