Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/20/2021 at 11:42:54 (UTC).

TAHEREH HEDJAZI VS MARIE LUNA

Case Summary

On 01/21/2021 TAHEREH HEDJAZI filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against MARIE LUNA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Inglewood Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is RONALD F. FRANK. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0071

  • Filing Date:

    01/21/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Inglewood Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

RONALD F. FRANK

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HEDJAZI TAHEREH

Defendant

LUNA MARIE

 

Court Documents

Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims) - Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

1/27/2021: Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims) - Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

1/21/2021: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

1/21/2021: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/21/2021
  • Hearing05/21/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 8 at One Regent Street, Inglewood, CA 90301; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • DocketProof of Service - Personal (Small Claims); Filed by: Tahereh Hedjazi (Plaintiff); As to: Marie Luna (Defendant); Service Cost: 40.00; Service Cost Waived: No; Service Date: 01/27/21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Tahereh Hedjazi (Plaintiff); As to: Marie Luna (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Ronald F. Frank in Department 8 Inglewood Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 05/21/2021 at 08:30 AM in Inglewood Courthouse at Department 8

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • DocketAuthorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims); Filed by: Tahereh Hedjazi (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less