This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/13/2022 at 15:56:41 (UTC).

SYNCHRONY BANK VS NORIK SHAKHNAZARYAN

Case Summary

On 11/24/2021 SYNCHRONY BANK filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against NORIK SHAKHNAZARYAN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Chatsworth Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is KAREN MOSKOWITZ. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0755

  • Filing Date:

    11/24/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

KAREN MOSKOWITZ

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SYNCHRONY BANK

Defendant

SHAKHNAZARYAN NORIK

Glendale, CA 91205

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ELMASSIAN BRIANNA

 

Court Documents

Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

11/24/2021: Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

11/24/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Summons - Summons on Complaint

11/24/2021: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

11/24/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint - Complaint

11/24/2021: Complaint - Complaint

Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

12/21/2021: Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/30/2022
  • Hearing11/30/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department F43 at 9425 Penfield Ave., Chatsworth, CA 91311; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Synchrony Bank (Plaintiff); As to: Norik Shakhnazaryan (Defendant); Service Date: 12/02/2021; Service Cost: 75.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Synchrony Bank (Plaintiff); As to: Norik Shakhnazaryan (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Synchrony Bank (Plaintiff); As to: Norik Shakhnazaryan (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Synchrony Bank (Plaintiff); As to: Norik Shakhnazaryan (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 scheduled for 11/30/2022 at 08:30 AM in Chatsworth Courthouse at Department F43

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Collections Case (CCP 3.740)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Karen Moskowitz in Department F43 Chatsworth Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Synchrony Bank is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ELMASSIAN BRIANNA