This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/16/2023 at 10:12:07 (UTC).

SYNCHRONY BANK VS JOSE HENRIQUEZ MELENDEZ

Case Summary

On 03/21/2023 SYNCHRONY BANK filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against JOSE HENRIQUEZ MELENDEZ. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Norwalk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is LILLIAN VEGA JACOBS. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7421

  • Filing Date:

    03/21/2023

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

LILLIAN VEGA JACOBS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SYNCHRONY BANK

Defendant

MELENDEZ JOSE HENRIQUEZ

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LEE SUNNY

 

Court Documents

Complaint - Complaint

3/21/2023: Complaint - Complaint

Summons - Summons on Complaint

3/21/2023: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

3/21/2023: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

3/21/2023: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

3/21/2023: Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

3/24/2023: Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

Declaration (name extension) - Declaration Declaration of Non Military Service

5/8/2023: Declaration (name extension) - Declaration Declaration of Non Military Service

Declaration (name extension) - Declaration Declaration of Interest

5/8/2023: Declaration (name extension) - Declaration Declaration of Interest

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

5/8/2023: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Default Judgment - Default Judgment Default Judgment

5/11/2023: Default Judgment - Default Judgment Default Judgment

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/11/2023
  • DocketDefault judgment by Clerk entered for Plaintiff Synchrony Bank against Defendant Jose Henriquez Melendez on the Complaint filed by Synchrony Bank on 03/21/2023 for the principal amount of $2,112.00 for a total of $2,112.00.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/11/2023
  • DocketDefault Judgment Default Judgment; Filed by: Synchrony Bank (Plaintiff); As to: Jose Henriquez Melendez (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/11/2023
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 scheduled for 03/26/2024 at 08:30 AM in Norwalk Courthouse at Department Y Not Held - Vacated by Court on 05/11/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/08/2023
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment Request for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by: Synchrony Bank (Plaintiff); As to: Jose Henriquez Melendez (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/08/2023
  • DocketDeclaration Declaration of Non Military Service; Filed by: Synchrony Bank (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/08/2023
  • DocketDeclaration Declaration of Interest; Filed by: Synchrony Bank (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/08/2023
  • DocketDefault entered as to Jose Henriquez Melendez; On the Complaint filed by Synchrony Bank on 03/21/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/24/2023
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Synchrony Bank (Plaintiff); As to: Jose Henriquez Melendez (Defendant); Service Date: 03/24/2023; Service Cost: 71.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/21/2023
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Synchrony Bank (Plaintiff); As to: Jose Henriquez Melendez (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/21/2023
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Synchrony Bank (Plaintiff); As to: Jose Henriquez Melendez (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/21/2023
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Synchrony Bank (Plaintiff); As to: Jose Henriquez Melendez (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/21/2023
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740); Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/21/2023
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/21/2023
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 scheduled for 03/26/2024 at 08:30 AM in Norwalk Courthouse at Department Y

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/21/2023
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Collections Case (CCP 3.740)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/21/2023
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Lillian Vega Jacobs in Department Y Norwalk Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less