This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/18/2023 at 21:55:27 (UTC).

SYNCHRONY BANK VS JEREMY C ALDRIGE

Case Summary

On 11/30/2022 SYNCHRONY BANK filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against JEREMY C ALDRIGE. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Chatsworth Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is NICHOLAS F. DAUM. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6687

  • Filing Date:

    11/30/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

NICHOLAS F. DAUM

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SYNCHRONY BANK

Defendant

ALDRIGE JEREMY C

Pacoima, CA 91331

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ELMASSIAN BRIANNA

 

Court Documents

Declaration (name extension) - Declaration of Venue

11/30/2022: Declaration (name extension) - Declaration of Venue

Summons - Summons on Complaint

11/30/2022: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Complaint - Complaint

11/30/2022: Complaint - Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

11/30/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

11/30/2022: Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

11/30/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

12/20/2022: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/06/2023
  • Hearing12/06/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department F43 at 9425 Penfield Ave., Chatsworth, CA 91311; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2022
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Synchrony Bank (Plaintiff); As to: JEREMY C ALDRIGE (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 12/19/2022; Service Cost: 75.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Synchrony Bank (Plaintiff); As to: JEREMY C ALDRIGE (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2022
  • DocketDeclaration of Venue; Filed by: Synchrony Bank (Plaintiff); As to: JEREMY C ALDRIGE (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Synchrony Bank (Plaintiff); As to: JEREMY C ALDRIGE (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Synchrony Bank (Plaintiff); As to: JEREMY C ALDRIGE (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740); Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 scheduled for 12/06/2023 at 08:30 AM in Chatsworth Courthouse at Department F43

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2022
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Collections Case (CCP 3.740)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Nicholas F. Daum in Department F43 Chatsworth Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Synchrony Bank is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ELMASSIAN BRIANNA