This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/30/2022 at 11:59:52 (UTC).

SYNCHRONY BANK VS FILOGONIO TRUJILLO

Case Summary

On 12/23/2021 SYNCHRONY BANK filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against FILOGONIO TRUJILLO. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Norwalk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MARIA ANDREA DAVALOS. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4442

  • Filing Date:

    12/23/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

MARIA ANDREA DAVALOS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SYNCHRONY BANK

Defendant

TRUJILLO FILOGONIO

Azusa, CA 91702-2830

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JORDAN CARINA M.

 

Court Documents

Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

12/23/2021: Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

12/23/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Complaint - Complaint

12/23/2021: Complaint - Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

12/23/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - Summons on Complaint

12/23/2021: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Declaration (name extension) - Declaration of Non-Service

1/3/2022: Declaration (name extension) - Declaration of Non-Service

Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

1/11/2022: Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/29/2022
  • Hearing12/29/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department A at 12720 Norwalk Blvd., Norwalk, CA 90650; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Synchrony Bank (Plaintiff); As to: Filogonio Trujillo (Defendant); Service Date: 01/09/2022; Service Cost: 71.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2022
  • DocketDeclaration of Non-Service; Filed by: Synchrony Bank (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Synchrony Bank (Plaintiff); As to: Filogonio Trujillo (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Synchrony Bank (Plaintiff); As to: Filogonio Trujillo (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2021
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Synchrony Bank (Plaintiff); As to: Filogonio Trujillo (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 scheduled for 12/29/2022 at 08:30 AM in Norwalk Courthouse at Department A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2021
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Collections Case (CCP 3.740)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Maria Andrea Davalos in Department A Norwalk Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Synchrony Bank is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jordan, Carina M