This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/27/2022 at 21:41:00 (UTC).

SUNRUN INSTALLATION SERVICES, INC. VS ERNEST BAGNER

Case Summary

On 08/17/2022 SUNRUN INSTALLATION SERVICES, INC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against ERNEST BAGNER. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MARK E. WINDHAM. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5466

  • Filing Date:

    08/17/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

MARK E. WINDHAM

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SUNRUN INSTALLATION SERVICES INC.

Defendant

BAGNER ERNEST

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LOCKE WENDY

 

Court Documents

Third Amended Standing Order - Third Amended Standing Order

8/17/2022: Third Amended Standing Order - Third Amended Standing Order

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

8/17/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Interp - General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Inter

8/17/2022: General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Interp - General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Inter

Complaint - Complaint

8/17/2022: Complaint - Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

8/17/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - Summons on Complaint

8/17/2022: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests - Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests

8/17/2022: Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests - Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests

Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

10/6/2022: Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/20/2025
  • Hearing08/20/2025 at 08:30 AM in Department 26 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2024
  • Hearing02/14/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 26 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/06/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: SunRun Installation Services, Inc. (Plaintiff); As to: Ernest Bagner (Defendant); Service Date: 09/10/2022; Service Cost: 95.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: SunRun Installation Services, Inc. (Plaintiff); As to: Ernest Bagner (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Mark E. Windham in Department 26 Spring Street Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: SunRun Installation Services, Inc. (Plaintiff); As to: Ernest Bagner (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: SunRun Installation Services, Inc. (Plaintiff); As to: Ernest Bagner (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2022
  • DocketThird Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2022
  • DocketGeneral Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Interpreter Requests; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2022
  • DocketNotice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2022
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 02/14/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 08/20/2025 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SUNRUN INSTALLATION SERVICES INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Locke, Wendy A