This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/22/2021 at 05:56:02 (UTC).

SUNLAND SCAFFOLD, INC. VS KAAT CONSTRUCTION, INC., ET AL.

Case Summary

On 07/08/2021 SUNLAND SCAFFOLD, INC filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against KAAT CONSTRUCTION, INC . This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is UPINDER S. KALRA. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5013

  • Filing Date:

    07/08/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

UPINDER S. KALRA

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SUNLAND SCAFFOLD INC.

Defendants

KAAT CONSTRUCTION INC.

ADVOCACY DEVELOPMENT PARTNERS LLC

ADP OF SAN DIMAS LLC

FREMONT BANK

AMERICAN CONTRACTORS INDEMNITY COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FILER NORMAN A. ESQ.

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

8/19/2021: Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

8/19/2021: Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests - Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests

7/8/2021: Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests - Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests

Complaint - Complaint

7/8/2021: Complaint - Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

7/8/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - Summons on Complaint

7/8/2021: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

7/8/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Third Amended Standing Order - Third Amended Standing Order

7/8/2021: Third Amended Standing Order - Third Amended Standing Order

General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Interp - General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Inter

7/8/2021: General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Interp - General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Inter

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/11/2024
  • Hearing07/11/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 26 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2023
  • Hearing01/05/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 26 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2021
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by Sunland Scaffold, Inc. on 07/08/2021, entered Request for Dismissal with prejudice filed by Sunland Scaffold, Inc. as to Advocacy Development Partners, LLC and ADP of San Dimas, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2021
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by Sunland Scaffold, Inc. on 07/08/2021, entered Request for Dismissal with prejudice filed by Sunland Scaffold, Inc., causes 3rd Cause of Action (foreclosure of mechanic's lien), ONLY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2021
  • DocketAddress for Norman A. Filer, Esq. (Attorney) null

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Sunland Scaffold, Inc. (Plaintiff); As to: Kaat Construction, Inc. (Defendant); Advocacy Development Partners, LLC (Defendant); ADP of San Dimas, LLC (Defendant) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Upinder S. Kalra in Department 26 Spring Street Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Sunland Scaffold, Inc. (Plaintiff); As to: Kaat Construction, Inc. (Defendant); Advocacy Development Partners, LLC (Defendant); ADP of San Dimas, LLC (Defendant) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Sunland Scaffold, Inc. (Plaintiff); As to: Kaat Construction, Inc. (Defendant); Advocacy Development Partners, LLC (Defendant); ADP of San Dimas, LLC (Defendant) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • DocketThird Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • DocketGeneral Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Interpreter Requests; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • DocketNotice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 07/11/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 01/05/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where KAAT CONSTRUCTION INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where FREMONT BANK, a California banking corporation is a litigant

Latest cases where American Contractors Indemnity Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer NORMAN A FILER