This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/03/2023 at 04:17:02 (UTC).

STRATEGIC FUNDING SOURCE, INC., A NEW YORK CORPORATION VS ADS MONOPOLY LLC, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 02/02/2021 STRATEGIC FUNDING SOURCE, INC , A NEW YORK CORPORATION filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against ADS MONOPOLY LLC,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is SERENA R. MURILLO. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0910

  • Filing Date:

    02/02/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

SERENA R. MURILLO

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STRATEGIC FUNDING SOURCE INC. A NEW YORK CORPORATION

Defendants

CARNEVALI JOHN

ADS MONOPOLY LLC DBA THE EXECUTIVE CO. A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST TO THE EXECUTIVE CUT AND SHAVE LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LEVIN PAUL ANDREW

Defendant Attorneys

ASATOURIAN MICHAEL

BENEDETTO JAMES

 

Court Documents

Status Report - Status Report

4/17/2023: Status Report - Status Report

Judgment - Judgment

3/28/2023: Judgment - Judgment

Objection (name extension) - Objection to Second Proposed Judgment

3/28/2023: Objection (name extension) - Objection to Second Proposed Judgment

Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

3/22/2023: Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

Notice of Lodging (name extension) - Notice of Lodging of Lodging of Plaintiff's Second Corrected Proposed Judgment

3/16/2023: Notice of Lodging (name extension) - Notice of Lodging of Lodging of Plaintiff's Second Corrected Proposed Judgment

Stipulation and Order (name extension) - Stipulation and Order Joint Stipulation to Continue Trial

12/9/2022: Stipulation and Order (name extension) - Stipulation and Order Joint Stipulation to Continue Trial

Order (name extension) - Order Continuing Trial Date

12/9/2022: Order (name extension) - Order Continuing Trial Date

Objection (name extension) - Objection Objection to Proposed Judgment

8/24/2022: Objection (name extension) - Objection Objection to Proposed Judgment

Notice of Lodging (name extension) - Notice of Lodging of Plaintiff's Corrected Proposed Judgment

8/4/2022: Notice of Lodging (name extension) - Notice of Lodging of Plaintiff's Corrected Proposed Judgment

Notice (name extension) - Notice of Trial Continuance

8/1/2022: Notice (name extension) - Notice of Trial Continuance

Objection (name extension) - Objection to [Proposed] Judgment Filed 7-8-2022

7/29/2022: Objection (name extension) - Objection to [Proposed] Judgment Filed 7-8-2022

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) - Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

7/29/2022: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) - Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Stipulation and Order (name extension) - Stipulation and Order Joint Stipulation to Continue Trial

8/1/2022: Stipulation and Order (name extension) - Stipulation and Order Joint Stipulation to Continue Trial

Order (name extension) - Order Proposed Order Continuing Trial Date

8/1/2022: Order (name extension) - Order Proposed Order Continuing Trial Date

Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service - Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service

6/29/2022: Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service - Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service

Objection (name extension) - Objection to Corrected Proposed Judgment

5/23/2022: Objection (name extension) - Objection to Corrected Proposed Judgment

Notice of Lodging (name extension) - Notice of Lodging of Plaintiff's Proposed Judgment Against Defendant John Carnevali

4/26/2022: Notice of Lodging (name extension) - Notice of Lodging of Plaintiff's Proposed Judgment Against Defendant John Carnevali

Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

4/26/2022: Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

44 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/28/2023
  • DocketCourt orders judgment entered for Plaintiff Strategic Funding Source, Inc., a New York corporation against Defendant John Carnevali on the Amended Complaint (1st) filed by Strategic Funding Source, Inc., a New York corporation on 02/11/2021 for damages of $21,479.00 and interest of $9,333.13 for a total of $30,812.13.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/28/2023
  • DocketStatus Conference Re: Entry of Judgment scheduled for 05/09/2023 at 09:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 04/28/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/28/2023
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 02/06/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 04/28/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/17/2023
  • DocketStatus Report; Filed by: Strategic Funding Source, Inc., a New York corporation (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/28/2023
  • DocketObjection to Second Proposed Judgment; Filed by: John Carnevali (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/28/2023
  • DocketJudgment; Signed and Filed by: Strategic Funding Source, Inc., a New York corporation (Plaintiff); As to: John Carnevali (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/28/2023
  • DocketUpdated -- Judgment: Filed By: Strategic Funding Source, Inc., a New York corporation (Plaintiff); Result: Granted ; Result Date: 03/28/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/22/2023
  • DocketStatus Conference Re: Entry of Judgment scheduled for 05/09/2023 at 09:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/22/2023
  • DocketMinute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/22/2023
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 03/22/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26 Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court on 03/22/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
63 More Docket Entries
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Strategic Funding Source, Inc., a New York corporation (Plaintiff); As to: John Carnevali (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 03/01/2021; Service Cost: 65.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/11/2021
  • DocketAmended Complaint (1st); Filed by: Strategic Funding Source, Inc., a New York corporation (Plaintiff); As to: ADS Monopoly LLC (Defendant); John Carnevali (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Strategic Funding Source, Inc., a New York corporation (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 08/02/2022 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 02/06/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Strategic Funding Source, Inc., a New York corporation (Plaintiff); As to: ADS Monopoly LLC (Defendant); John Carnevali (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Strategic Funding Source, Inc., a New York corporation (Plaintiff); As to: ADS Monopoly LLC (Defendant); John Carnevali (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • DocketFirst Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Serena R. Murillo in Department 26 Spring Street Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less