This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/09/2022 at 00:13:18 (UTC).

STEVEN M RICH, ET AL. VS CAS FINANCIAL SERVICES, INC, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 08/11/2021 STEVEN M RICH filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against CAS FINANCIAL SERVICES, INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is KATHERINE CHILTON. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5891

  • Filing Date:

    08/11/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

KATHERINE CHILTON

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

RICH STEVEN M

RICH MICHELLE L

Defendants

CAS FINANCIAL SERVICES INC DBA CENTURY AUTO SPORT A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

THE GUARANTEE COMPANY OF NORTH AMERICA USA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SADR KASRA

Defendant Attorney

NEHORAY MAC E

 

Court Documents

Third Amended Standing Order - Third Amended Standing Order

8/11/2021: Third Amended Standing Order - Third Amended Standing Order

General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Interp - General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Inter

8/11/2021: General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Interp - General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Inter

Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests - Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests

8/11/2021: Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests - Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

8/11/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Summons - Summons on Complaint

8/11/2021: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Complaint - Complaint

8/11/2021: Complaint - Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

8/11/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

10/18/2021: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment - Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

10/18/2021: Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment - Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

10/14/2021: Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

10/14/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Answer - Answer

10/13/2021: Answer - Answer

Answer - Answer

11/1/2021: Answer - Answer

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/14/2024
  • Hearing08/14/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 25 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2023
  • Hearing02/08/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 25 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: THE GUARANTEE COMPANY OF NORTH AMERICA USA (Defendant); As to: Steven M Rich (Plaintiff); Michelle L Rich (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2021
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by: Steven M Rich (Plaintiff); Michelle L Rich (Plaintiff); As to: Cas Financial Services, Inc (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2021
  • DocketNotice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Steven M Rich (Plaintiff); Michelle L Rich (Plaintiff); As to: Cas Financial Services, Inc (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 09/02/2021; Service Cost: 106.25; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Steven M Rich (Plaintiff); Michelle L Rich (Plaintiff); As to: THE GUARANTEE COMPANY OF NORTH AMERICA USA (Defendant); Service Date: 09/01/2021; Service Cost: 40.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: Cas Financial Services, Inc (Defendant); As to: Steven M Rich (Plaintiff); Michelle L Rich (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Steven M Rich (Plaintiff); Michelle L Rich (Plaintiff); As to: Cas Financial Services, Inc (Defendant); THE GUARANTEE COMPANY OF NORTH AMERICA USA (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Katherine Chilton in Department 25 Spring Street Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Steven M Rich (Plaintiff); Michelle L Rich (Plaintiff); As to: Cas Financial Services, Inc (Defendant); THE GUARANTEE COMPANY OF NORTH AMERICA USA (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Steven M Rich (Plaintiff); Michelle L Rich (Plaintiff); As to: Cas Financial Services, Inc (Defendant); THE GUARANTEE COMPANY OF NORTH AMERICA USA (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • DocketThird Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • DocketGeneral Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Interpreter Requests; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • DocketNotice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 02/08/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 08/14/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where The Guarantee Company of North America USA is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer NEHORAY MAC E