This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/26/2022 at 10:14:33 (UTC).

STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY VS ROBERT CORNELIO LLAMAS

Case Summary

On 12/16/2021 STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against ROBERT CORNELIO LLAMAS. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is UPINDER S. KALRA. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******8927

  • Filing Date:

    12/16/2021

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

UPINDER S. KALRA

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

Defendant

LLAMAS ROBERT CORNELIO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

STRUMWASSER GREGG

 

Court Documents

General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Interp - General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Inter

12/16/2021: General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Interp - General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Inter

Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests - Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests

12/16/2021: Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests - Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests

Complaint - Complaint

12/16/2021: Complaint - Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

12/16/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Summons - Summons on Complaint

12/16/2021: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Third Amended Standing Order - Third Amended Standing Order

12/16/2021: Third Amended Standing Order - Third Amended Standing Order

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

12/16/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

1/20/2022: Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

1/18/2022: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/25/2022
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 06/15/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 01/25/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 12/19/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 01/25/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • DocketAddress for Gregg Strumwasser (Attorney) null

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY on 12/16/2021, entered Request for Dismissal with prejudice filed by STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY as to the entire action

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY (Plaintiff); As to: ROBERT CORNELIO LLAMAS (Defendant); Service Cost: 70.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/17/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Upinder S. Kalra in Department 26 Spring Street Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/17/2021
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 06/15/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/17/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 12/19/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY (Plaintiff); As to: ROBERT CORNELIO LLAMAS (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY (Plaintiff); As to: ROBERT CORNELIO LLAMAS (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2021
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY (Plaintiff); As to: ROBERT CORNELIO LLAMAS (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2021
  • DocketThird Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2021
  • DocketGeneral Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Interpreter Requests; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2021
  • DocketNotice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer STRUMWASSER, GREGG