Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/05/2021 at 13:11:05 (UTC).

STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY VS NAYELI TAMAYO, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 01/19/2021 STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against NAYELI TAMAYO. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JAMES E. BLANCARTE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0480

  • Filing Date:

    01/19/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

JAMES E. BLANCARTE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

Defendants

VEGA ERIC

TAMAYO NAYELI

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MAHFOUZ RICHARD L.

Defendant Attorney

NEPOMUCENO ERWIN A.

 

Court Documents

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees - Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

3/29/2021: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees - Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Answer - Answer

3/29/2021: Answer - Answer

Demand for Jury Trial - Demand for Jury Trial

3/29/2021: Demand for Jury Trial - Demand for Jury Trial

Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

2/2/2021: Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

Complaint - Complaint

1/19/2021: Complaint - Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

1/19/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

1/19/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Summons - Summons on Complaint

1/19/2021: Summons - Summons on Complaint

First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

1/19/2021: First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/23/2024
  • Hearing01/23/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 25 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2022
  • Hearing07/19/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 25 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: Nayeli Tamayo (Defendant); Eric Vega (Defendant); As to: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial; Filed by: Nayeli Tamayo (Defendant); Eric Vega (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: Nayeli Tamayo (Defendant); Eric Vega (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company (Plaintiff); As to: Nayeli Tamayo (Defendant); Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company (Plaintiff); As to: Nayeli Tamayo (Defendant); Eric Vega (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company (Plaintiff); As to: Nayeli Tamayo (Defendant); Eric Vega (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company (Plaintiff); As to: Nayeli Tamayo (Defendant); Eric Vega (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • DocketFirst Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 07/19/2022 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 01/23/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. James E. Blancarte in Department 25 Spring Street Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MAHFOUZ RICHARD L.