This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/27/2021 at 05:30:10 (UTC).

STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY VS NATHAN RYAN BEAN

Case Summary

On 10/05/2021 STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against NATHAN RYAN BEAN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is KATHERINE CHILTON. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7259

  • Filing Date:

    10/05/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

KATHERINE CHILTON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

Defendant

BEAN NATHAN RYAN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

MAGPAPIAN MANUEL M

PETROSYAN VARDUHI ROSE ESQ.

Defendant Attorney

HARN KRISTINE L.

 

Court Documents

Third Amended Standing Order - Third Amended Standing Order

10/5/2021: Third Amended Standing Order - Third Amended Standing Order

General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Interp - General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Inter

10/5/2021: General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Interp - General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Inter

Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests - Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests

10/5/2021: Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests - Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

10/5/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Complaint - Complaint

10/5/2021: Complaint - Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

10/5/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - Summons on Complaint

10/5/2021: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

10/19/2021: Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

Order (name extension) - Order ON REQUEST TO OPT OUT OF CASE NUMBER: MANDATORY EXPEDITED JURY TRIAL PROCEDURES

11/19/2021: Order (name extension) - Order ON REQUEST TO OPT OUT OF CASE NUMBER: MANDATORY EXPEDITED JURY TRIAL PROCEDURES

Request to Opt Out of Mandatory Expedited Jury Trial Procedures - Request to Opt Out of Mandatory Expedited Jury Trial Procedures

11/17/2021: Request to Opt Out of Mandatory Expedited Jury Trial Procedures - Request to Opt Out of Mandatory Expedited Jury Trial Procedures

Answer - Answer

11/17/2021: Answer - Answer

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/08/2024
  • Hearing10/08/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 25 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2023
  • Hearing04/04/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 25 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • DocketOrder ON REQUEST TO OPT OUT OF CASE NUMBER: MANDATORY EXPEDITED JURY TRIAL PROCEDURES; Signed and Filed by: NATHAN RYAN BEAN (Defendant); As to: STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • DocketUpdated -- Order ON REQUEST TO OPT OUT OF CASE NUMBER: MANDATORY EXPEDITED JURY TRIAL PROCEDURES: Filed By: NATHAN RYAN BEAN (Defendant); Result: Granted; Result Date: 11/19/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: NATHAN RYAN BEAN (Defendant); As to: STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2021
  • DocketRequest to Opt Out of Mandatory Expedited Jury Trial Procedures; Filed by: NATHAN RYAN BEAN (Defendant); As to: STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY (Plaintiff); As to: NATHAN RYAN BEAN (Defendant); Service Date: 10/11/2021; Service Cost: 70.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY (Plaintiff); As to: NATHAN RYAN BEAN (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Katherine Chilton in Department 25 Spring Street Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY (Plaintiff); As to: NATHAN RYAN BEAN (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY (Plaintiff); As to: NATHAN RYAN BEAN (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • DocketThird Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • DocketGeneral Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Interpreter Requests; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • DocketNotice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 04/04/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 10/08/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer HARN KRISTINE L.