This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/22/2021 at 15:49:14 (UTC).

STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY VS NANCY LOPEZ, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 06/16/2021 STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against NANCY LOPEZ. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is KATHERINE CHILTON. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4510

  • Filing Date:

    06/16/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

KATHERINE CHILTON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

Defendants

LOPEZ NANCY

MORELOS VICTOR M.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MAGPAPIAN MANUEL M

Defendant Attorney

NEPOMUCENO ERWIN A.

 

Court Documents

Answer - Answer

9/2/2021: Answer - Answer

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees - Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

9/2/2021: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees - Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

7/8/2021: Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service) - Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service)

7/8/2021: Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service) - Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service)

Complaint - Complaint

6/16/2021: Complaint - Complaint

Summons - Summons on Complaint

6/16/2021: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

6/16/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

6/16/2021: First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

6/16/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/19/2024
  • Hearing06/19/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 25 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2022
  • Hearing12/14/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 25 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: NANCY LOPEZ (Defendant); VICTOR M. MORELOS (Defendant); As to: STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: NANCY LOPEZ (Defendant); VICTOR M. MORELOS (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • DocketProof of Mailing (Substituted Service); Filed by: STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY (Plaintiff); As to: VICTOR M. MORELOS (Defendant); Mailing Date: 06/28/2021; Service Cost: 70.00; Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY (Plaintiff); As to: NANCY LOPEZ (Defendant); Service Date: 06/28/2021; Service Cost: 70.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY (Plaintiff); As to: NANCY LOPEZ (Defendant); VICTOR M. MORELOS (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY (Plaintiff); As to: NANCY LOPEZ (Defendant); VICTOR M. MORELOS (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY (Plaintiff); As to: NANCY LOPEZ (Defendant); VICTOR M. MORELOS (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • DocketFirst Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 12/14/2022 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 06/19/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Katherine Chilton in Department 25 Spring Street Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer NEPOMUCENO ERWIN A.