Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/08/2021 at 10:00:54 (UTC).

STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY VS MICHAEL RAMOS

Case Summary

On 01/05/2021 STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against MICHAEL RAMOS. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is SERENA R. MURILLO. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0061

  • Filing Date:

    01/05/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

SERENA R. MURILLO

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

Defendant

RAMOS MICHAEL AKA MICHAEL AGUILAR

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ESPINOSA TRISTAN P

Defendant Attorneys

FARKHONDEH TARA

ESCOBAR JOSE A.

 

Court Documents

Notice (name extension) - Notice of Change of Handling Attorney

4/21/2021: Notice (name extension) - Notice of Change of Handling Attorney

Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

2/10/2021: Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

2/11/2021: Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

Answer - Answer

3/2/2021: Answer - Answer

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees - Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

3/2/2021: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees - Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

1/5/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - Summons on Complaint

1/5/2021: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Declaration (name extension) - Declaration of Venue

1/5/2021: Declaration (name extension) - Declaration of Venue

Complaint - Complaint

1/5/2021: Complaint - Complaint

First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

1/5/2021: First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

1/5/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/09/2024
  • Hearing01/09/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 26 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2022
  • Hearing07/05/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 26 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • DocketUpdated -- Jose A. Escobar (Attorney): First Name changed from Tara to Jose; Last Name changed from Farkhondeh to Escobar; Organization Name changed from Fred Loya Insurance to Chavez Legal Group; Middle Name: A.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • DocketAddress for Jose A. Escobar (Attorney) null

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • DocketNotice of Change of Handling Attorney; Filed by: MICHAEL RAMOS (Defendant); As to: STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: MICHAEL RAMOS (Defendant); As to: STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: MICHAEL RAMOS (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY (Plaintiff); As to: MICHAEL RAMOS (Defendant); Service Date: 01/22/2021; Service Cost: 80.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY (Plaintiff); As to: MICHAEL RAMOS (Defendant); Service Date: 01/22/2021; Service Cost: 80.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 07/05/2022 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 01/09/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY (Plaintiff); As to: MICHAEL RAMOS (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY (Plaintiff); As to: MICHAEL RAMOS (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY (Plaintiff); As to: MICHAEL RAMOS (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • DocketDeclaration of Venue; Filed by: STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY (Plaintiff); As to: MICHAEL RAMOS (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • DocketFirst Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Serena R. Murillo in Department 26 Spring Street Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ESPINOSA, TRISTAN P.