This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/16/2021 at 14:09:33 (UTC).

STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY VS MARIO FRANCISCO PALACIOS

Case Summary

On 06/25/2021 STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against MARIO FRANCISCO PALACIOS. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is UPINDER S. KALRA. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4722

  • Filing Date:

    06/25/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

UPINDER S. KALRA

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

Defendant

PALACIOS MARIO FRANCISCO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

MAGPAPIAN MANUEL M

PETROSYAN VARDUHI ROSE

Defendant Attorney

CAOILE MICHAEL F

 

Court Documents

Answer - Answer

8/19/2021: Answer - Answer

Demand for Jury Trial - Demand for Jury Trial

8/19/2021: Demand for Jury Trial - Demand for Jury Trial

Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service) - Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service)

7/22/2021: Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service) - Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service)

Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests - Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests

6/25/2021: Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests - Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests

Summons - Summons on Complaint

6/25/2021: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Complaint - Complaint

6/25/2021: Complaint - Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

6/25/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Interp - General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Inter

6/25/2021: General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Interp - General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Inter

Third Amended Standing Order - Third Amended Standing Order

6/25/2021: Third Amended Standing Order - Third Amended Standing Order

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

6/25/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/28/2024
  • Hearing06/28/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 26 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2022
  • Hearing12/23/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 26 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: MARIO FRANCISCO PALACIOS (Defendant); As to: STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2021
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial; Filed by: MARIO FRANCISCO PALACIOS (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • DocketProof of Mailing (Substituted Service); Filed by: STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY (Plaintiff); As to: MARIO FRANCISCO PALACIOS (Defendant); Mailing Date: 07/11/2021; Service Cost: 70.00; Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY (Plaintiff); As to: MARIO FRANCISCO PALACIOS (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Upinder S. Kalra in Department 26 Spring Street Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY (Plaintiff); As to: MARIO FRANCISCO PALACIOS (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY (Plaintiff); As to: MARIO FRANCISCO PALACIOS (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • DocketThird Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • DocketGeneral Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Interpreter Requests; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • DocketNotice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 12/23/2022 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 06/28/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer CAOILE MICHAEL F.