This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/01/2022 at 22:12:32 (UTC).

STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY VS LILIANA IRENE RAMIREZ

Case Summary

On 06/25/2021 STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against LILIANA IRENE RAMIREZ. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is UPINDER S. KALRA. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4727

  • Filing Date:

    06/25/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

UPINDER S. KALRA

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

Cross Plaintiffs, Defendants and Not Classified By Court

RAMIREZ LILIANA IRENE

ROES 1 THROUGH V INCLUSIVE

ALVARADO ARLENE MICHELLE

Cross Defendants and Not Classified By Court

ROES 1 THROUGH V INCLUSIVE

ALVARADO ARLENE MICHELLE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BENSON SUSAN M

Cross Plaintiff and Defendant Attorneys

SMITH-MARS DENISE A

SANCHEZ BRIAN

 

Court Documents

Third Amended Standing Order - Third Amended Standing Order

6/25/2021: Third Amended Standing Order - Third Amended Standing Order

General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Interp - General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Inter

6/25/2021: General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Interp - General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Inter

Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests - Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests

6/25/2021: Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests - Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

6/25/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

6/25/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - Summons on Complaint

6/25/2021: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Complaint - Complaint

6/25/2021: Complaint - Complaint

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

7/23/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Summons - Summons Cross Summons

10/18/2021: Summons - Summons Cross Summons

Notice of Rejection of Electronic Filing - Notice of Rejection of Electronic Filing

10/6/2021: Notice of Rejection of Electronic Filing - Notice of Rejection of Electronic Filing

Cross-Complaint - Cross-Complaint

10/6/2021: Cross-Complaint - Cross-Complaint

Request to Opt Out of Mandatory Expedited Jury Trial Procedures - Request to Opt Out of Mandatory Expedited Jury Trial Procedures

10/6/2021: Request to Opt Out of Mandatory Expedited Jury Trial Procedures - Request to Opt Out of Mandatory Expedited Jury Trial Procedures

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees - Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

10/1/2021: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees - Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Demand for Jury Trial - Demand for Jury Trial

10/1/2021: Demand for Jury Trial - Demand for Jury Trial

Answer - Answer

10/1/2021: Answer - Answer

Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

12/3/2021: Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

Association of Attorney - Association of Attorney

2/14/2022: Association of Attorney - Association of Attorney

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/28/2024
  • Hearing06/28/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 26 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2022
  • Hearing12/23/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 26 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2022
  • DocketAssociation of Attorney; Filed by: Liliana Irene Ramirez (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2021
  • DocketOn the Cross-Complaint filed by Liliana Irene Ramirez on 10/06/2021, entered Request for Dismissal without prejudice filed by Liliana Irene Ramirez as to Roes 1 through V, Inclusive and ARLENE MICHELLE ALVARADO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2021
  • DocketUpdated -- DENISE A SMITH-MARS (Attorney): Organization Name: Gilsleider, McMahon, Molinelli & Phan

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2021
  • DocketAddress for DENISE A SMITH-MARS (Attorney) null

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2021
  • DocketSummons Cross Summons; Issued and Filed by: Liliana Irene Ramirez (Cross-Complainant); As to: Roes 1 through V, Inclusive (Cross-Defendant); ARLENE MICHELLE ALVARADO (Cross-Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2021
  • DocketUpdated -- Roes 1 through V, Inclusive: Organization Name changed from ROES 1 THROUGH V, INCLUSIVE to Roes 1 through V, Inclusive

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • DocketUpdated -- Request to Opt Out of Mandatory Expedited Jury Trial Procedures: Filed By: Liliana Irene Ramirez (Defendant); Result: Rejected; Result Date: 10/08/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • DocketCross-Complaint; Filed by: Liliana Irene Ramirez (Defendant); As to: ROES 1 THROUGH V, INCLUSIVE (Cross-Defendant); ARLENE MICHELLE ALVARADO (Cross-Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 06/25/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company (Plaintiff); As to: Liliana Irene Ramirez (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Upinder S. Kalra in Department 26 Spring Street Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company (Plaintiff); As to: Liliana Irene Ramirez (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company (Plaintiff); As to: Liliana Irene Ramirez (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • DocketThird Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • DocketGeneral Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Interpreter Requests; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • DocketNotice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 12/23/2022 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 06/28/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SANCHEZ BRIAN

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SMITH-MARS DENISE A