This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/13/2021 at 03:41:59 (UTC).

STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY VS EVA DURAN

Case Summary

On 02/10/2021 STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against EVA DURAN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JAMES E. BLANCARTE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1199

  • Filing Date:

    02/10/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

JAMES E. BLANCARTE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

Defendant

DURAN EVA AKA EVA CONRADO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ESPINOSA TRISTAN P

 

Court Documents

Declaration re: Due Diligence - Declaration re: Due Diligence

3/12/2021: Declaration re: Due Diligence - Declaration re: Due Diligence

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

2/10/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - Summons on Complaint

2/10/2021: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Complaint - Complaint

2/10/2021: Complaint - Complaint

First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

2/10/2021: First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

2/10/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/14/2024
  • Hearing02/14/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 25 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2022
  • Hearing08/10/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 25 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY (Plaintiff); As to: EVA DURAN (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY (Plaintiff); As to: EVA DURAN (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2021
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY (Plaintiff); As to: EVA DURAN (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2021
  • DocketFirst Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2021
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 08/10/2022 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 02/14/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. James E. Blancarte in Department 25 Spring Street Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ESPINOSA, TRISTAN P.