This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/16/2023 at 03:13:35 (UTC).

STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY VS DAVID MARIO ELMANGE

Case Summary

On 11/23/2022 STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against DAVID MARIO ELMANGE. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is KATHERINE CHILTON. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7881

  • Filing Date:

    11/23/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

KATHERINE CHILTON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

Defendant

ELMANGE DAVID MARIO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BENSON SUSAN M.

Defendant Attorney

MICHAELSON LINDSAY J

 

Court Documents

Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests - Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests

11/23/2022: Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests - Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests

Summons - Summons on Complaint

11/23/2022: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

11/23/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint - Complaint

11/23/2022: Complaint - Complaint

General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Interp - General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Inter

11/23/2022: General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Interp - General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Inter

Third Amended Standing Order - Third Amended Standing Order

11/23/2022: Third Amended Standing Order - Third Amended Standing Order

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

11/23/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service) - Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service)

12/19/2022: Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service) - Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service)

Answer - Answer

1/4/2023: Answer - Answer

Request to Opt Out of Mandatory Expedited Jury Trial Procedures - Request to Opt Out of Mandatory Expedited Jury Trial Procedures

1/4/2023: Request to Opt Out of Mandatory Expedited Jury Trial Procedures - Request to Opt Out of Mandatory Expedited Jury Trial Procedures

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees - Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

1/4/2023: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees - Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Demand for Jury Trial - Demand for Jury Trial

1/4/2023: Demand for Jury Trial - Demand for Jury Trial

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/26/2025
  • Hearing11/26/2025 at 08:30 AM in Department 25 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/22/2024
  • Hearing05/22/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 25 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2023
  • DocketUpdated -- Request to Opt Out of Mandatory Expedited Jury Trial Procedures: Name Extension: blank ; Document changed from Order (name extension) to Request to Opt Out of Mandatory Expedited Jury Trial Procedures ; As To Parties changed from State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company (Plaintiff) to State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2023
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: David Mario Elmange (Defendant); As to: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2023
  • DocketRequest to Opt Out of Mandatory Expedited Jury Trial Procedures; Filed by: David Mario Elmange (Defendant); As to: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2023
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial; Filed by: David Mario Elmange (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2023
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: David Mario Elmange (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2023
  • DocketOrder on Request to Opt Out of Mandatory Expedited Jury Trial Procedures; Proposed - Received by: David Mario Elmange (Defendant); As to: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2022
  • DocketProof of Mailing (Substituted Service); Filed by: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company (Plaintiff); As to: David Mario Elmange (Defendant); Mailing Date: 12/13/2022; Service Cost: 69.00; Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company (Plaintiff); As to: David Mario Elmange (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Katherine Chilton in Department 25 Spring Street Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company (Plaintiff); As to: David Mario Elmange (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company (Plaintiff); As to: David Mario Elmange (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • DocketThird Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • DocketGeneral Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Interpreter Requests; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • DocketNotice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 05/22/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 11/26/2025 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MICHAELSON LINDSAY J.