Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/04/2021 at 14:59:48 (UTC).

STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY VS DARIKA ESTHER MELENDEZ

Case Summary

On 03/26/2021 STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against DARIKA ESTHER MELENDEZ. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is UPINDER S. KALRA. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2452

  • Filing Date:

    03/26/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

UPINDER S. KALRA

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

Defendant

MELENDEZ DARIKA ESTHER

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BENSON SUSAN M

Defendant Attorney

MANDELL BARBARA J.

 

Court Documents

Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

4/27/2021: Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

Demand for Jury Trial - Demand for Jury Trial

5/10/2021: Demand for Jury Trial - Demand for Jury Trial

Answer - Answer

5/10/2021: Answer - Answer

Summons - Summons on Complaint

3/26/2021: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

3/26/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

3/26/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Complaint - Complaint

3/26/2021: Complaint - Complaint

First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

3/26/2021: First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/29/2024
  • Hearing03/29/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 26 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2022
  • Hearing09/23/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 26 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: Darika Esther Melendez (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial; Filed by: Darika Esther Melendez (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company (Plaintiff); As to: Darika Esther Melendez (Defendant); Service Date: 04/09/2021; Service Cost: 67.50; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company (Plaintiff); As to: Darika Esther Melendez (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company (Plaintiff); As to: Darika Esther Melendez (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company (Plaintiff); As to: Darika Esther Melendez (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • DocketFirst Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 09/23/2022 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 03/29/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Upinder S. Kalra in Department 26 Spring Street Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BENSON SUSAN M