This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/06/2021 at 11:05:51 (UTC).

STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY VS CARLOS TAZEJ GODOY

Case Summary

On 03/12/2021 STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against CARLOS TAZEJ GODOY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is UPINDER S. KALRA. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2096

  • Filing Date:

    03/12/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

UPINDER S. KALRA

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

Defendants

GODOY CARLOS TAZEJ

DE LA ADILA DOMINGO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BENSON SUSAN M

Defendant Attorney

JOZANA KOREN

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

3/12/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

3/12/2021: First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

Summons - Summons on Complaint

3/12/2021: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

3/12/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint - Complaint

3/12/2021: Complaint - Complaint

Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

4/20/2021: Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

Answer - Answer

4/14/2021: Answer - Answer

Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name) - Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

6/25/2021: Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name) - Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/15/2024
  • Hearing03/15/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 26 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2022
  • Hearing09/09/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 26 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • DocketUpdated -- Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name): As To Parties changed from Carlos Cazej Godoy Erroneously Sued As Carlos Tazej Godoy (Defendant), Domingo De La Adila (Defendant) to Domingo De La Adila (Defendant), Carlos Cazej Godoy Erroneously Sued As Carlos Tazej Godoy (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • DocketAmendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name); Filed by: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company (Plaintiff); As to: Carlos Cazej Godoy Erroneously Sued As Carlos Tazej Godoy (Defendant); Domingo De La Adila (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company (Plaintiff); As to: Carlos Cazej Godoy Erroneously Sued As Carlos Tazej Godoy (Defendant); Service Date: 03/23/2021; Service Cost: 67.50; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: Carlos Cazej Godoy Erroneously Sued As Carlos Tazej Godoy (Defendant); As to: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company (Plaintiff); As to: Carlos Tazej Godoy (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company (Plaintiff); As to: Carlos Tazej Godoy (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company (Plaintiff); As to: Carlos Tazej Godoy (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • DocketFirst Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 09/09/2022 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 03/15/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Upinder S. Kalra in Department 26 Spring Street Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BENSON SUSAN M