This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/30/2021 at 12:11:24 (UTC).

STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY VS CARLOS ERNESTO AREVALO MEJIA

Case Summary

On 03/12/2021 STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against CARLOS ERNESTO AREVALO MEJIA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JAMES E. BLANCARTE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2085

  • Filing Date:

    03/12/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

JAMES E. BLANCARTE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

Defendant

AREVALO MEJIA CARLOS ERNESTO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MAHFOUZ RICHARD L.

Defendant Attorney

JOZANA KOREN

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

3/12/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

3/12/2021: First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

Summons - Summons on Complaint

3/12/2021: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

3/12/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint - Complaint

3/12/2021: Complaint - Complaint

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

5/7/2021: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

4/13/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Answer - Answer

6/15/2021: Answer - Answer

Stipulation and Order (name extension) - Stipulation and Order TO SET ASIDE DEFAULT

7/15/2021: Stipulation and Order (name extension) - Stipulation and Order TO SET ASIDE DEFAULT

Answer - Answer

7/15/2021: Answer - Answer

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/15/2024
  • Hearing03/15/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 25 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2022
  • Hearing09/09/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 25 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • DocketUpdated -- Answer: Status Date changed from 06/15/2021 to 07/15/2021; As To Parties changed from State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company (Plaintiff) to State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company on 03/12/2021, Default entered on 05/07/2021, Vacated - Stipulation to set aside default..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • DocketUpdated -- Stipulation and Order TO SET ASIDE DEFAULT: Filed By: Carlos Ernesto Arevalo Mejia (Defendant); Result: Granted; Result Date: 07/15/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: Carlos Ernesto Arevalo Mejia (Defendant); As to: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company (Plaintiff); As to: Carlos Ernesto Arevalo Mejia (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • DocketDefault entered as to Carlos Ernesto Arevalo Mejia; On the Complaint filed by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company on 03/12/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company (Plaintiff); As to: Carlos Ernesto Arevalo Mejia (Defendant); Service Cost: 45.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company (Plaintiff); As to: Carlos Ernesto Arevalo Mejia (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company (Plaintiff); As to: Carlos Ernesto Arevalo Mejia (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company (Plaintiff); As to: Carlos Ernesto Arevalo Mejia (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • DocketFirst Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 09/09/2022 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 03/15/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. James E. Blancarte in Department 25 Spring Street Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer JOZANA KOREN