This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/27/2022 at 21:28:52 (UTC).

STARNET INSURANCE COMPANY VS FOUNDATION TECH, INC., A CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 08/17/2022 STARNET INSURANCE COMPANY filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against FOUNDATION TECH, INC , A CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Chatsworth Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is TRICIA TAYLOR. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******8167

  • Filing Date:

    08/17/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

TRICIA TAYLOR

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STARNET INSURANCE COMPANY

Defendant

FOUNDATION TECH INC. A CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GABA RODOLFO JR

 

Court Documents

Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

8/17/2022: Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

8/17/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

8/17/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint - Complaint

8/17/2022: Complaint - Complaint

Summons - Summons on Complaint

8/17/2022: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

10/5/2022: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/23/2023
  • Hearing08/23/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department F43 at 9425 Penfield Ave., Chatsworth, CA 91311; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/05/2022
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Starnet Insurance Company (Plaintiff); As to: Foundation Tech, Inc., a corporation (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 09/29/2022; Service Cost: 99.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/19/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 scheduled for 08/23/2023 at 08:30 AM in Chatsworth Courthouse at Department F43

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/19/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Tricia Taylor in Department F43 Chatsworth Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Starnet Insurance Company (Plaintiff); As to: Foundation Tech, Inc., a corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Starnet Insurance Company (Plaintiff); As to: Foundation Tech, Inc., a corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Starnet Insurance Company (Plaintiff); As to: Foundation Tech, Inc., a corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740); Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2022
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Collections Case (CCP 3.740)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where FOUNDATION TECH INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where STARNET INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer GABA RODOLFO