This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/01/2021 at 01:40:40 (UTC).

STACY ARNOLD VS AD ASTRA RECOVERY, INC., ET AL.

Case Summary

On 03/24/2021 STACY ARNOLD filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against AD ASTRA RECOVERY, INC . This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Van Nuys Courthouse East located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is RICHARD F. WALMARK. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0650

  • Filing Date:

    03/24/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

RICHARD F. WALMARK

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ARNOLD STACY

Defendants

AD ASTRA RECOVERY INC.

SPEEDY CASH

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

6/24/2021: Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

3/24/2021: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court, Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Meet and Confer Small Claims, Notice of Re

3/30/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court, Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Meet and Confer Small Claims, Notice of Re

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/28/2021
  • DocketMinute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • DocketOn the Plaintiff's Claim filed by Stacy Arnold on 03/24/2021, entered Order for Dismissal without prejudice as to the entire action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 06/28/2021 at 01:30 PM in Van Nuys Courthouse East at Department P Not Held - Vacated by Court on 06/28/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by: Stacy Arnold (Plaintiff); As to: Speedy Cash (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • DocketOn the Plaintiff's Claim filed by Stacy Arnold on 03/24/2021, entered Request for Dismissal with prejudice filed by Stacy Arnold as to Speedy Cash

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 06/28/2021 at 08:30 AM in Van Nuys Courthouse East at Department P

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • DocketNotice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol; Issued by: Clerk; As to: Stacy Arnold (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • DocketNotice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Meet and Confer ? Small Claims; Issued by: Clerk; As to: Stacy Arnold (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for [Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court, Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Meet and Confer ? Small Claims, Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol]; Issued and Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • DocketReset - Court Unavailable, Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 06/28/2021 at 08:30 AM in Van Nuys Courthouse East at Department P Not Held - Rescheduled by Court was rescheduled to 06/28/2021 01:30 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Stacy Arnold (Plaintiff); As to: Ad Astra Recovery, Inc. (Defendant); Speedy Cash (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Richard F. Walmark in Department P Van Nuys Courthouse East

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where AD Astra Recovery Services, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where SPEEDY FUEL INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant