This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/23/2021 at 00:01:14 (UTC).

SPECTRUM HOLDINGS AND DEVELOPMENT, LLC VS LAW OFFICE OF YOUSEF MONADJEMANI

Case Summary

On 01/11/2021 SPECTRUM HOLDINGS AND DEVELOPMENT, LLC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against LAW OFFICE OF YOUSEF MONADJEMANI. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Van Nuys Courthouse East located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is RICHARD F. WALMARK. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0032

  • Filing Date:

    01/11/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Courthouse:

    Van Nuys Courthouse East

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

RICHARD F. WALMARK

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SPECTRUM HOLDINGS AND DEVELOPMENT LLC

Defendants

LAW OFFICE OF YOUSEF MONADJEMANI

MONADJEMANI YOUSEF

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

4/9/2021: Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Request for Dismissal]

4/16/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Request for Dismissal]

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Meet and Confer]

2/25/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Meet and Confer]

Notice of Postponement - Notice of Postponement

3/24/2021: Notice of Postponement - Notice of Postponement

Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims) - Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims)

3/24/2021: Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims) - Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims)

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

1/11/2021: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for [Request for Dismissal]; Issued by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketUpdated -- Certificate of Mailing for [Request for Dismissal] s.a.s.e.: Name Extension changed from [Request for Dismissal] to [Request for Dismissal] s.a.s.e. As To Parties: removed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 06/21/2021 at 01:30 PM in Van Nuys Courthouse East at Department P Not Held - Vacated by Court on 04/16/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by: SPECTRUM HOLDINGS AND DEVELOPMENT, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: LAW OFFICE OF YOUSEF MONADJEMANI (Defendant); YOUSEF MONADJEMANI (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • DocketOn the Plaintiff's Claim filed by SPECTRUM HOLDINGS AND DEVELOPMENT, LLC on 01/11/2021, entered Request for Dismissal with prejudice filed by SPECTRUM HOLDINGS AND DEVELOPMENT, LLC as to LAW OFFICE OF YOUSEF MONADJEMANI and YOUSEF MONADJEMANI

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • DocketNotice of Postponement; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • DocketPursuant to the request of defendant, Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 04/12/2021 at 01:30 PM in Van Nuys Courthouse East at Department P Not Held - Rescheduled by Party was rescheduled to 06/21/2021 01:30 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • DocketRequest to Postpone Trial (Small Claims); Filed by: YOUSEF MONADJEMANI (Defendant); Has the Claim Been Served?: Yes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • DocketNotice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Meet and Confer; Issued by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for [Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Meet and Confer]; Issued and Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2021
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: SPECTRUM HOLDINGS AND DEVELOPMENT, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: LAW OFFICE OF YOUSEF MONADJEMANI (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Richard F. Walmark in Department P Van Nuys Courthouse East

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2021
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 04/12/2021 at 08:30 AM in Van Nuys Courthouse East at Department P

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2021
  • DocketNotice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol; Issued by: Clerk; As to: SPECTRUM HOLDINGS AND DEVELOPMENT, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2021
  • DocketUpdated -- Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court: As To Parties changed from LAW OFFICE OF YOUSEF MONADJEMANI (Defendant) to LAW OFFICE OF YOUSEF MONADJEMANI (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2021
  • DocketThere being no judge available this date, Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 04/12/2021 at 08:30 AM in Van Nuys Courthouse East at Department P Not Held - Rescheduled by Court was rescheduled to 04/12/2021 01:30 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SPECTRUM HOLDINGS AND DEVELOPMENT LLC is a litigant