Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/10/2021 at 00:04:02 (UTC).

SOUTHWEST HEATING AND AIR CONDITIONING INC. VS GILBERT MATTHIEU

Case Summary

On 03/09/2021 SOUTHWEST HEATING AND AIR CONDITIONING INC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against GILBERT MATTHIEU. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Inglewood Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is RONALD F. FRANK. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0297

  • Filing Date:

    03/09/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Inglewood Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

RONALD F. FRANK

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SOUTHWEST HEATING AND AIR CONDITIONING INC.

Defendant

MATTHIEU GILBERT

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

4/8/2021: Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 04/08/2021

4/8/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 04/08/2021

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

3/10/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

3/9/2021: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/08/2021
  • DocketAuthorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims); Filed by: Southwest Heating and Air Conditioning Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • DocketOn the Plaintiff's Claim filed by Southwest Heating and Air Conditioning Inc. on 03/09/2021, entered Order for Dismissal without prejudice as to the entire action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • DocketMinute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 04/08/2021; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 04/08/2021 at 08:30 AM in Inglewood Courthouse at Department 8 updated: Result Date to 04/08/2021; Result Type to Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Southwest Heating and Air Conditioning Inc. (Plaintiff); As to: Gilbert Matthieu (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 03/10/2021; Service Cost: 40.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Southwest Heating and Air Conditioning Inc. (Plaintiff); As to: Gilbert Matthieu (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Ronald F. Frank in Department 8 Inglewood Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 04/08/2021 at 08:30 AM in Inglewood Courthouse at Department 8

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SOUTHWEST HEATING & AIR CONDITIONING INC. is a litigant