Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/02/2021 at 11:01:20 (UTC).

SOUTHWEST HEATING AND AIR CONDITIONING INC. VS BRYAN P. VAN BLARCOM

Case Summary

On 03/05/2021 SOUTHWEST HEATING AND AIR CONDITIONING INC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against BRYAN P VAN BLARCOM. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0100

  • Filing Date:

    03/05/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SOUTHWEST HEATING AND AIR CONDITIONING INC.

Defendant

VAN BLARCOM BRYAN P.

 

Court Documents

Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims) - Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

3/11/2021: Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims) - Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

3/5/2021: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/27/2021
  • Hearing04/27/2021 at 10:00 AM in Department A22 at 42011 4th Street West, Lancaster, CA 93534; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • DocketCase reassigned to Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse in Department A22 - Hon. Marcelo D'Asero; Reason: Other

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • DocketUpdated -- Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims): As To Parties changed from Bryan P. Van Blarcom (Defendant) to Bryan P. Van Blarcom (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • DocketProof of Service - Personal (Small Claims); Filed by: Southwest Heating and Air Conditioning Inc. (Plaintiff); As to: Bryan P. Van Blarcom (Defendant); Service Cost: 40.00; Service Cost Waived: No; Service Date: 03/09/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Southwest Heating and Air Conditioning Inc. (Plaintiff); As to: Bryan P. Van Blarcom (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • DocketCase assigned in Department A22 Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 04/27/2021 at 10:00 AM in Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse at Department A22

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SOUTHWEST HEATING & AIR CONDITIONING INC. is a litigant