This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/01/2021 at 08:26:36 (UTC).

SOUTHERN GLAZER?S WINE & SPIRITS, LLC, A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY VS GASLAMP PARTNERS, LLC, A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 09/16/2021 SOUTHERN GLAZER S WINE SPIRITS, LLC, A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against GASLAMP PARTNERS, LLC, A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is UPINDER S. KALRA. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6739

  • Filing Date:

    09/16/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

UPINDER S. KALRA

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SOUTHERN GLAZER?S WINE & SPIRITS LLC A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY FKA SOUTHERN WINE & SPIRITS OF AMERICA INC. A CORPORATION

Defendants

GASLAMP PARTNERS LLC A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY DBA GASLAMP

DEL SIGNORE JOE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

VORONIN YURI ESQ.

 

Court Documents

Complaint - Complaint

9/16/2021: Complaint - Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

9/16/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

9/16/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Summons - Summons on Complaint

9/16/2021: Summons - Summons on Complaint

General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Interp - General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Inter

9/16/2021: General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Interp - General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Inter

Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests - Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests

9/16/2021: Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests - Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests

Third Amended Standing Order - Third Amended Standing Order

9/16/2021: Third Amended Standing Order - Third Amended Standing Order

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/19/2024
  • Hearing09/19/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 26 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2023
  • Hearing03/16/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 26 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: SOUTHERN GLAZER?S WINE & SPIRITS, LLC, a Limited Liability Company (Plaintiff); As to: GASLAMP PARTNERS, LLC, a Limited Liability Company (Defendant); JOE DEL SIGNORE (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Upinder S. Kalra in Department 26 Spring Street Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: SOUTHERN GLAZER?S WINE & SPIRITS, LLC, a Limited Liability Company (Plaintiff); As to: GASLAMP PARTNERS, LLC, a Limited Liability Company (Defendant); JOE DEL SIGNORE (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • DocketThird Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • DocketGeneral Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Interpreter Requests; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • DocketNotice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 03/16/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 09/19/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: SOUTHERN GLAZER?S WINE & SPIRITS, LLC, a Limited Liability Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where GASLAMP PARTNERS LLC A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY DBA GASLAMP RESTAURANT AND BAR is a litigant

Latest cases where SOUTHERN GLAZER'S WINE & SPIRITS LLC. is a litigant