This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/09/2022 at 16:00:54 (UTC).

SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA GAS COMPANY VS HORIZON UNDERGROUND, INC., ET AL.

Case Summary

On 08/30/2022 SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA GAS COMPANY filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against HORIZON UNDERGROUND, INC ,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MARK E. WINDHAM. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5721

  • Filing Date:

    08/30/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

MARK E. WINDHAM

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA GAS COMPANY

Defendants

HORIZON UNDERGROUND INC.

VINCULUMS SERVICES LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LEVY NAZILA YAMIN

 

Court Documents

Complaint - Complaint

8/30/2022: Complaint - Complaint

General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Interp - General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Inter

8/30/2022: General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Interp - General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Inter

Summons - Summons on Complaint

8/30/2022: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests - Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests

8/30/2022: Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests - Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests

Third Amended Standing Order - Third Amended Standing Order

8/30/2022: Third Amended Standing Order - Third Amended Standing Order

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

8/30/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

8/30/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

10/5/2022: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

10/5/2022: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/02/2025
  • Hearing09/02/2025 at 08:30 AM in Department 26 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/27/2024
  • Hearing02/27/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 26 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/05/2022
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Southern California Gas Company (Plaintiff); As to: Vinculums Services, LLC (Defendant); Service Cost: 80.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/05/2022
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Southern California Gas Company (Plaintiff); As to: Horizon Underground, Inc. (Defendant); Service Cost: 75.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/31/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Mark E. Windham in Department 26 Spring Street Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/31/2022
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 02/27/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/31/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 09/02/2025 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/30/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Southern California Gas Company (Plaintiff); As to: Horizon Underground, Inc. (Defendant); Vinculums Services, LLC (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/30/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Southern California Gas Company (Plaintiff); As to: Horizon Underground, Inc. (Defendant); Vinculums Services, LLC (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/30/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Southern California Gas Company (Plaintiff); As to: Horizon Underground, Inc. (Defendant); Vinculums Services, LLC (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/30/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/30/2022
  • DocketThird Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/30/2022
  • DocketGeneral Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Interpreter Requests; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/30/2022
  • DocketNotice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where HORIZON UNDERGROUND INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where VINCULUMS SERVICES LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA GAS COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LEVY NAZILA Y. ESQ.