This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/15/2022 at 14:09:07 (UTC).

SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA GAS COMPANY, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION VS MELBA SAENZ PADILLA

Case Summary

On 08/30/2022 SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA GAS COMPANY, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against MELBA SAENZ PADILLA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is KATHERINE CHILTON. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5722

  • Filing Date:

    08/30/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

KATHERINE CHILTON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA GAS COMPANY A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Defendant

PADILLA MELBA SAENZ

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LEVY NAZILA YAMIN

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

8/30/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Interp - General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Inter

8/30/2022: General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Interp - General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Inter

Third Amended Standing Order - Third Amended Standing Order

8/30/2022: Third Amended Standing Order - Third Amended Standing Order

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

8/30/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - Summons on Complaint

8/30/2022: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Complaint - Complaint

8/30/2022: Complaint - Complaint

Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests - Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests

8/30/2022: Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests - Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/02/2025
  • Hearing09/02/2025 at 08:30 AM in Department 25 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/27/2024
  • Hearing02/27/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 25 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/31/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Katherine Chilton in Department 25 Spring Street Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/31/2022
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 02/27/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/31/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 09/02/2025 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/30/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Southern California Gas Company, a California Corporation (Plaintiff); As to: Melba Saenz Padilla (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/30/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Southern California Gas Company, a California Corporation (Plaintiff); As to: Melba Saenz Padilla (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/30/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Southern California Gas Company, a California Corporation (Plaintiff); As to: Melba Saenz Padilla (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/30/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/30/2022
  • DocketThird Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/30/2022
  • DocketGeneral Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Interpreter Requests; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/30/2022
  • DocketNotice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA GAS COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LEVY NAZILA Y. ESQ.