This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/20/2022 at 07:32:13 (UTC).

SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION VS PEI ZHU FRINGER, TRUSTEE OF THE PEI ZHU FRINGER TRUST, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 01/10/2022 SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against PEI ZHU FRINGER, TRUSTEE OF THE PEI ZHU FRINGER TRUST. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is KATHERINE CHILTON. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0180

  • Filing Date:

    01/10/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

KATHERINE CHILTON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Not Classified By Court and Defendants

PEI ZHU FRINGER TRUSTEE OF THE PEI ZHU FRINGER TRUST

SNOW CONSTRUCTION LA LLC

SNOW BILLY DBA SNOW CONSTRUCTION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LEVY NAZILA Y. ESQ.

Defendant Attorney

MELKONIAN GEOFFREY

 

Court Documents

General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Interp - General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Inter

1/10/2022: General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Interp - General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Inter

Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests - Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests

1/10/2022: Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests - Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests

Complaint - Complaint

1/10/2022: Complaint - Complaint

Third Amended Standing Order - Third Amended Standing Order

1/10/2022: Third Amended Standing Order - Third Amended Standing Order

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

1/10/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

1/10/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Summons - Summons on Complaint

1/10/2022: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

3/29/2022: Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

5/11/2022: Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

Answer - Answer

5/10/2022: Answer - Answer

Summons - Summons on Cross-Complaint

5/9/2022: Summons - Summons on Cross-Complaint

Cross-Complaint - Cross-Complaint

5/9/2022: Cross-Complaint - Cross-Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/13/2025
  • Hearing01/13/2025 at 08:30 AM in Department 25 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2023
  • Hearing07/10/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 25 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Southern California Edison Company, a California Corporation (Plaintiff); As to: Snow Construction LA LLC (Defendant); Service Date: 05/05/2022; Service Cost: 150.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: Pei Zhu Fringer, Trustee of the Pei Zhu Fringer Trust (Defendant); As to: Southern California Edison Company, a California Corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2022
  • DocketCross-Complaint; Filed by: Pei Zhu Fringer, Trustee of the Pei Zhu Fringer Trust (Defendant); As to: Billy Snow (Cross-Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2022
  • DocketSummons on Cross-Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Pei Zhu Fringer, Trustee of the Pei Zhu Fringer Trust (Defendant); As to: Billy Snow (Cross-Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Southern California Edison Company, a California Corporation (Plaintiff); As to: Pei Zhu Fringer, Trustee of the Pei Zhu Fringer Trust (Defendant); Service Date: 03/22/2022; Service Cost: 75.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Southern California Edison Company, a California Corporation (Plaintiff); As to: Pei Zhu Fringer, Trustee of the Pei Zhu Fringer Trust (Defendant); Snow Construction LA LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Katherine Chilton in Department 25 Spring Street Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Southern California Edison Company, a California Corporation (Plaintiff); As to: Pei Zhu Fringer, Trustee of the Pei Zhu Fringer Trust (Defendant); Snow Construction LA LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Southern California Edison Company, a California Corporation (Plaintiff); As to: Pei Zhu Fringer, Trustee of the Pei Zhu Fringer Trust (Defendant); Snow Construction LA LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • DocketThird Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • DocketGeneral Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Interpreter Requests; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • DocketNotice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 07/10/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 01/13/2025 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MELKONIAN GEOFFREY