Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/09/2021 at 15:42:56 (UTC).

SOUTH BAY CREST HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION VS MITSUO ASAMI

Case Summary

On 03/05/2021 SOUTH BAY CREST HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION filed an Other lawsuit against MITSUO ASAMI. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is UPINDER S. KALRA. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1904

  • Filing Date:

    03/05/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

UPINDER S. KALRA

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SOUTH BAY CREST HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION

Defendant

ASAMI MITSUO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MEDIONI DANIEL

 

Court Documents

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

4/14/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

3/5/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - Summons on Complaint

3/5/2021: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Complaint - Complaint

3/5/2021: Complaint - Complaint

First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

3/5/2021: First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

3/5/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/08/2024
  • Hearing03/08/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 26 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2022
  • Hearing09/02/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 26 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: SOUTH BAY CREST HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION (Plaintiff); As to: MITSUO ASAMI (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 04/12/2021; Service Cost: 80.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: SOUTH BAY CREST HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION (Plaintiff); As to: MITSUO ASAMI (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: SOUTH BAY CREST HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION (Plaintiff); As to: MITSUO ASAMI (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: SOUTH BAY CREST HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION (Plaintiff); As to: MITSUO ASAMI (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • DocketFirst Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 09/02/2022 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 03/08/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Upinder S. Kalra in Department 26 Spring Street Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer MEDIONI DANIEL M