Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/11/2021 at 01:49:53 (UTC).

SOFYA STRAUSER VS HORIZON REAL ESTATE MANAGEMENT

Case Summary

On 01/27/2021 SOFYA STRAUSER filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against HORIZON REAL ESTATE MANAGEMENT. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Inglewood Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is RONALD F. FRANK. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0105

  • Filing Date:

    01/27/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Inglewood Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

RONALD F. FRANK

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STRAUSER SOFYA

Defendants

HORIZON REAL ESTATE MANAGEMBET

AFK PROPERTY HOLDINGS LLC

 

Court Documents

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Notice Online dispute resolution ( ODR) meet and confer]

3/24/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Notice Online dispute resolution ( ODR) meet and confer]

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

5/25/2021: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims) - Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

5/25/2021: Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims) - Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 05/25/2021, Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets

5/25/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 05/25/2021, Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets

Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

5/25/2021: Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims) - Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

2/18/2021: Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims) - Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

1/27/2021: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/25/2021
  • DocketAuthorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims); Filed by: Non-Party / Other

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • DocketCourt orders judgment entered for Plaintiff Sofya Strauser against Defendant AFK Property Holdings, LLC on the Plaintiff's Claim filed by Sofya Strauser on 01/27/2021 for the principal amount of $1,200.00 and costs of $115.00 for a total of $1,315.00.; Other: Plaintiff returned the uncashed $243 refund check during the trial. The Court has allowed many of the Defendant's itemized deductions, reduced some others, resulting in the net refund amount.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • DocketMinute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 05/25/2021, Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • DocketUpdated -- AFK Property Holdings, LLC (Defendant): Organization Name changed from Horizon Real Estate Management to AFK Property Holdings, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 05/25/2021 at 01:30 PM in Inglewood Courthouse at Department 8 updated: Result Date to 05/25/2021; Result Type to Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • DocketUpdated -- Horizon Real Estate Management (Defendant): Organization Name changed from Horizon Real Estate Managembet to Horizon Real Estate Management

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • Docket** Case Name changed from SOFYA STRAUSER vs HORIZON REAL ESTATE MANAGEMBET to SOFYA STRAUSER vs HORIZON REAL ESTATE MANAGEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • DocketNotice Notice of remote appearance and exchange and submission of evidence protocol; Issued by: Clerk; As to: Sofya Strauser (Plaintiff); Horizon Real Estate Managembet (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • DocketNotice Online dispute resolution ( ODR) meet and confer; Issued by: Clerk; As to: Sofya Strauser (Plaintiff); Horizon Real Estate Managembet (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for [Notice Online dispute resolution ( ODR) meet and confer]; Issued by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • DocketProof of Service - Personal (Small Claims); Filed by: Sofya Strauser (Plaintiff); As to: Horizon Real Estate Managembet (Defendant); Service Cost: 40.00; Service Cost Waived: No; Service Date: 02/16/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Sofya Strauser (Plaintiff); As to: Horizon Real Estate Managembet (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Ronald F. Frank in Department 8 Inglewood Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 05/25/2021 at 01:30 PM in Inglewood Courthouse at Department 8

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where HORIZON REAL ESTATE MANAGEMENT INC is a litigant