This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/11/2021 at 10:23:50 (UTC).

SOCAL LIEN SOLUTIONS LLC VS VILLA CAPRI CONDOMINIUM ASSOCIATION, INC

Case Summary

On 09/22/2021 SOCAL LIEN SOLUTIONS LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against VILLA CAPRI CONDOMINIUM ASSOCIATION, INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Chatsworth Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is RANDY RHODES. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4232

  • Filing Date:

    09/22/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

RANDY RHODES

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SOCAL LIEN SOLUTIONS LLC

Defendant

VILLA CAPRI CONDOMINIUM ASSOCIATION INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PARIKH SAGAR P.

 

Court Documents

Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

9/22/2021: Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

9/22/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Summons - Summons on Complaint

9/22/2021: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

9/22/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint - Complaint

9/22/2021: Complaint - Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/28/2022
  • Hearing09/28/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department F43 at 9425 Penfield Ave., Chatsworth, CA 91311; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 scheduled for 09/28/2022 at 08:30 AM in Chatsworth Courthouse at Department F43

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Randy Rhodes in Department F43 Chatsworth Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: SOCAL LIEN SOLUTIONS LLC (Plaintiff); As to: VILLA CAPRI CONDOMINIUM ASSOCIATION, INC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: SOCAL LIEN SOLUTIONS LLC (Plaintiff); As to: VILLA CAPRI CONDOMINIUM ASSOCIATION, INC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: SOCAL LIEN SOLUTIONS LLC (Plaintiff); As to: VILLA CAPRI CONDOMINIUM ASSOCIATION, INC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Collections Case (CCP 3.740)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SOCAL LIEN SOLUTIONS LLC is a litigant