This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/19/2021 at 16:14:19 (UTC).

SOCAL LIEN SOLUTIONS LLC VS BUILT TO PERFECTION INC, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 09/22/2021 SOCAL LIEN SOLUTIONS LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against BUILT TO PERFECTION INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Chatsworth Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is RANDY RHODES. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4193

  • Filing Date:

    09/22/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

RANDY RHODES

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SOCAL LIEN SOLUTIONS LLC

Defendants

BUILT TO PERFECTION INC

SMITH DEIDRA

SMITH AMBROJHA

DEIDRA MONIQUE SMITH TRUSTEE OF THE SMITH TRUST UTA DATED JUNE 17 2021

AMBROJHA DEVTRE SMITH TRUSTEE OF THE SMITH TRUST UTA DATED JUNE 17 2021

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PARIKH SAGAR P.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/28/2022
  • Hearing09/28/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department F43 at 9425 Penfield Ave., Chatsworth, CA 91311; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2021
  • DocketAmended Complaint (1st); Filed by: SOCAL LIEN SOLUTIONS LLC (Plaintiff); As to: BUILT TO PERFECTION INC (Defendant); DEIDRA SMITH (Defendant); AMBROJHA SMITH (Defendant) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: SOCAL LIEN SOLUTIONS LLC (Plaintiff); As to: BUILT TO PERFECTION INC (Defendant); DEIDRA SMITH (Defendant); AMBROJHA SMITH (Defendant) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 scheduled for 09/28/2022 at 08:30 AM in Chatsworth Courthouse at Department F43

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Randy Rhodes in Department F43 Chatsworth Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: SOCAL LIEN SOLUTIONS LLC (Plaintiff); As to: BUILT TO PERFECTION INC (Defendant); DEIDRA SMITH (Defendant); AMBROJHA SMITH (Defendant) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: SOCAL LIEN SOLUTIONS LLC (Plaintiff); As to: BUILT TO PERFECTION INC (Defendant); DEIDRA SMITH (Defendant); AMBROJHA SMITH (Defendant) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Collections Case (CCP 3.740)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BUILT TO PERFECTION INC is a litigant

Latest cases where SOCAL LIEN SOLUTIONS LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer PARIKH SAGAR P.