This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/03/2021 at 15:31:43 (UTC).

SOCAL LIEN SOLUTIONS LLC VS AMIR BAHARESTANI, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 04/28/2021 SOCAL LIEN SOLUTIONS LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against AMIR BAHARESTANI. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Chatsworth Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is KAREN MOSKOWITZ. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7114

  • Filing Date:

    04/28/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

KAREN MOSKOWITZ

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SOCAL LIEN SOLUTIONS LLC

Defendants

BAHARESTANI AMIR

BAHARESTANI SHAKROKH

BAHARESTANI SAHAR

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PARIKH SAGAR P.

Defendant Attorney

ADLI DARIUSH G.

 

Court Documents

Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

4/28/2021: Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

4/28/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Summons - Summons on Complaint

4/28/2021: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

4/28/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint - Complaint

4/28/2021: Complaint - Complaint

Notice of Trial - Notice of Trial

6/15/2021: Notice of Trial - Notice of Trial

Answer - Answer

6/14/2021: Answer - Answer

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/04/2022
  • Hearing05/04/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department F43 at 9425 Penfield Ave., Chatsworth, CA 91311; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • DocketNotice of Trial; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • DocketUpdated -- Event scheduled for 05/04/2022 at 08:30 AM in Chatsworth Courthouse at Department F43 Type changed from Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 to Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: AMIR BAHARESTANI (Defendant); SAHAR BAHARESTANI (Defendant); SHAKROKH BAHARESTANI (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • DocketCase reassigned to Chatsworth Courthouse in Department F43 - Hon. Randy Rhodes; Reason: Inventory Transfer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: SOCAL LIEN SOLUTIONS LLC (Plaintiff); As to: AMIR BAHARESTANI (Defendant); SAHAR BAHARESTANI (Defendant); SHAKROKH BAHARESTANI (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: SOCAL LIEN SOLUTIONS LLC (Plaintiff); As to: AMIR BAHARESTANI (Defendant); SAHAR BAHARESTANI (Defendant); SHAKROKH BAHARESTANI (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: SOCAL LIEN SOLUTIONS LLC (Plaintiff); As to: AMIR BAHARESTANI (Defendant); SAHAR BAHARESTANI (Defendant); SHAKROKH BAHARESTANI (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 scheduled for 05/04/2022 at 08:30 AM in Chatsworth Courthouse at Department F43

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Collections Case (CCP 3.740)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Karen Moskowitz in Department F43 Chatsworth Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SOCAL LIEN SOLUTIONS LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ADLI DARIUSH G.