This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/30/2022 at 02:44:30 (UTC).

SHIRIN SEPANIAN VS ADVENTIST HEALTH GLENDALE

Case Summary

On 11/12/2021 SHIRIN SEPANIAN filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against ADVENTIST HEALTH GLENDALE. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Pasadena Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is BEVERLY BOURNE. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2147

  • Filing Date:

    11/12/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

BEVERLY BOURNE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SEPANIAN SHIRIN

Defendant

ADVENTIST HEALTH GLENDALE

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

10/27/2022: Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

Small Claims Settlement Agreement - Small Claims Settlement Agreement

10/27/2022: Small Claims Settlement Agreement - Small Claims Settlement Agreement

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) By Akabi Danielian

10/27/2022: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) By Akabi Danielian

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) By Denise Faught

10/27/2022: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) By Denise Faught

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 10/27/2022

10/27/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 10/27/2022

Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

9/29/2022: Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 09/29/2022

9/29/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 09/29/2022

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) by Linda W. Taetz on behalf of Glendale Operation Company LP

9/29/2022: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) by Linda W. Taetz on behalf of Glendale Operation Company LP

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) by Alex De La Cuadra behalf of Glendale Operation Company LP

9/29/2022: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) by Alex De La Cuadra behalf of Glendale Operation Company LP

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) by Denise Faught, Manager

9/29/2022: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) by Denise Faught, Manager

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) by Akabi Danielian, Daughter

9/29/2022: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) by Akabi Danielian, Daughter

Notice (name extension) - defendant Glendale Adventist Medical Center DBA Adventist Health Glendale`s Small Claims Trial Brief; Declaration of Denise Faught

9/22/2022: Notice (name extension) - defendant Glendale Adventist Medical Center DBA Adventist Health Glendale`s Small Claims Trial Brief; Declaration of Denise Faught

Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims) - Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

8/18/2022: Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims) - Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Amended Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court (Amended)

8/3/2022: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Amended Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court (Amended)

Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

7/12/2022: Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 07/12/2022

7/12/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 07/12/2022

Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service) - Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service)

7/12/2022: Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service) - Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service)

Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims) - Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

5/11/2022: Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims) - Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

20 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/27/2022
  • DocketAuthorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) By Akabi Danielian; Filed by: Adventist Health Glendale (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2022
  • DocketAuthorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) By Denise Faught; Filed by: Adventist Health Glendale (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) By Akabi Danielian: As To Parties: removed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2022
  • DocketSmall Claims Settlement Agreement; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2022
  • DocketOn the Plaintiff's Claim filed by Shirin Sepanian on 11/12/2021, entered Order for Dismissal without prejudice as to the entire action

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2022
  • DocketMinute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2022
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 10/27/2022; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2022
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 10/27/2022 at 01:30 PM in Pasadena Courthouse at Department A updated: Result Date to 10/27/2022; Result Type to Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/06/2022
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 10/27/2022 at 01:30 PM in Pasadena Courthouse at Department A

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/06/2022
  • DocketPursuant to oral stipulation, Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 09/29/2022 at 01:30 PM in Pasadena Courthouse at Department A Not Held - Continued - Stipulation was rescheduled to 10/27/2022 01:30 PM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
34 More Docket Entries
  • 01/05/2022
  • DocketRequest to Postpone Trial (Small Claims); Filed by: Shirin Sepanian (Plaintiff); Has the Claim Been Served?: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court: As To Parties changed from Mariner Healthcare (Defendant), CT Corporation System (Defendant) to Mariner Healthcare (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2022
  • DocketAmended Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Shirin Sepanian (Plaintiff); As to: Mariner Health Care Management Company, a corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2022
  • DocketAuthorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) By Akabi Danielian; Filed by: Shirin Sepanian (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) By Akabi Danielian: As To Parties: removed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/12/2021
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Shirin Sepanian (Plaintiff); As to: Mariner Healthcare (Defendant); CT Corporation System (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/12/2021
  • DocketNotice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/12/2021
  • DocketNotice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Program - Small Claims; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/12/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Beverly Bourne in Department A Pasadena Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/12/2021
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 01/18/2022 at 10:00 AM in Pasadena Courthouse at Department A

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ADVENTIST HEALTH GLENDALE is a litigant