This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/21/2021 at 05:55:00 (UTC).

SHERMAN WAY TOWNHOMES ASSOC., INC., A CALIFORNIA NON-PROFIT CORPORATION VS GEORGE CACERES

Case Summary

On 04/08/2021 SHERMAN WAY TOWNHOMES ASSOC , INC , A CALIFORNIA NON-PROFIT CORPORATION filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against GEORGE CACERES. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JAMES E. BLANCARTE. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2799

  • Filing Date:

    04/08/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

JAMES E. BLANCARTE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SHERMAN WAY TOWNHOMES ASSOC. INC. A CALIFORNIA NON-PROFIT CORPORATION

Defendant

CACERES GEORGE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WATSON JOSEPH C. ESQ.

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

4/8/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

4/8/2021: First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

Complaint - Complaint

4/8/2021: Complaint - Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

4/8/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - Summons on Complaint

4/8/2021: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

4/13/2021: Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

Default Judgment - Default Judgment

6/1/2021: Default Judgment - Default Judgment

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

5/24/2021: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Declaration (name extension) - Declaration in support of default judgment

5/24/2021: Declaration (name extension) - Declaration in support of default judgment

Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

5/17/2021: Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

5/17/2021: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment - Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment

7/26/2021: Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment - Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/26/2021
  • DocketAcknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment; Filed by: Sherman Way Townhomes Assoc., Inc., a California non-profit corporation (Plaintiff); As to: George Caceres (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • DocketDefault judgment by Court entered for Plaintiff Sherman Way Townhomes Assoc., Inc., a California non-profit corporation against Defendant George Caceres on the Complaint filed by Sherman Way Townhomes Assoc., Inc., a California non-profit corporation on 04/08/2021 for damages of $3,462.40 and costs of $320.00 for a total of $3,782.40.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • DocketDefault Judgment; Signed and Filed by: Sherman Way Townhomes Assoc., Inc., a California non-profit corporation (Plaintiff); As to: George Caceres (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • DocketUpdated -- Default Judgment: As To Parties changed from George Caceres (Defendant) to George Caceres (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 10/06/2022 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 06/01/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 04/11/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 06/01/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2021
  • Docket; On the Complaint filed by Sherman Way Townhomes Assoc., Inc., a California non-profit corporation on 04/08/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2021
  • DocketDeclaration in support of default judgment; Filed by: Sherman Way Townhomes Assoc., Inc., a California non-profit corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2021
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by: Sherman Way Townhomes Assoc., Inc., a California non-profit corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Sherman Way Townhomes Assoc., Inc., a California non-profit corporation (Plaintiff); As to: George Caceres (Defendant); Service Date: 04/12/2021; Service Cost: 95.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 05/17/2021
  • DocketDefault entered as to George Caceres; On the Complaint filed by Sherman Way Townhomes Assoc., Inc., a California non-profit corporation on 04/08/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Sherman Way Townhomes Assoc., Inc., a California non-profit corporation (Plaintiff); As to: George Caceres (Defendant); Service Date: 04/12/2021; Service Cost: 89.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 04/11/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 10/06/2022 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. James E. Blancarte in Department 25 Spring Street Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • DocketFirst Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Sherman Way Townhomes Assoc., Inc., a California non-profit corporation (Plaintiff); As to: George Caceres (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Sherman Way Townhomes Assoc., Inc., a California non-profit corporation (Plaintiff); As to: George Caceres (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Sherman Way Townhomes Assoc., Inc., a California non-profit corporation (Plaintiff); As to: George Caceres (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SHERMAN WAY TOWNHOMES ASSOC. INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer WATSON JOSEPH C.