This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/16/2021 at 13:29:00 (UTC).

SHAWN LAMBERT HVAC, INC VS DAVID BARTON, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 04/09/2021 SHAWN LAMBERT HVAC, INC filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against DAVID BARTON. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JAMES E. BLANCARTE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2827

  • Filing Date:

    04/09/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

JAMES E. BLANCARTE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SHAWN LAMBERT HVAC INC

Defendants

DUPUY TAMMY

BARTON DAVID

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

SANDERS STEPHEN M.

KHALILPOUR MIKE

GREEN SCOTT THOMAS

Defendant Attorney

ELLIOTT CHRISTOPHER R.

 

Court Documents

Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

7/30/2021: Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

Answer - Answer

8/2/2021: Answer - Answer

Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

5/7/2021: Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

Notice of Lis Pendens - Notice of Lis Pendens

4/19/2021: Notice of Lis Pendens - Notice of Lis Pendens

Summons - Summons on Complaint

4/9/2021: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

4/9/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

4/9/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

4/9/2021: First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

Complaint - Complaint

4/9/2021: Complaint - Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

4/9/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/12/2024
  • Hearing04/12/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 25 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2022
  • Hearing10/07/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 25 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: David Barton (Defendant); Tammy Dupuy (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Shawn Lambert HVAC, Inc (Plaintiff); As to: David Barton (Defendant); Service Date: 05/12/2021; Service Cost Waived: Yes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Shawn Lambert HVAC, Inc (Plaintiff); As to: Tammy Dupuy (Defendant); Service Date: 04/13/2021; Service Cost: 85.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • DocketNotice of Lis Pendens; Filed by: Shawn Lambert HVAC, Inc (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Shawn Lambert HVAC, Inc (Plaintiff); As to: David Barton (Defendant); Tammy Dupuy (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Shawn Lambert HVAC, Inc (Plaintiff); As to: David Barton (Defendant); Tammy Dupuy (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Shawn Lambert HVAC, Inc (Plaintiff); As to: David Barton (Defendant); Tammy Dupuy (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • DocketFirst Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 10/07/2022 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 04/12/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Shawn Lambert HVAC, Inc (Plaintiff); As to: David Barton (Defendant); Tammy Dupuy (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. James E. Blancarte in Department 25 Spring Street Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Sanders, Stephen M

Latest cases represented by Lawyer GREEN SCOTT THOMAS