This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/10/2021 at 12:57:29 (UTC).

SHAWN DAKHILI DAKHILI VS HONDA LEASE TRUST

Case Summary

On 01/05/2021 SHAWN DAKHILI DAKHILI filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against HONDA LEASE TRUST. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Compton Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is VICTOR M. ACEVEDO. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0004

  • Filing Date:

    01/05/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Compton Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

VICTOR M. ACEVEDO

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

DAKHILI SHAWN DAKHILI

DAKHILI SHAWN

Defendant

HONDA LEASE TRUST

 

Court Documents

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

4/1/2021: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

4/1/2021: Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 04/01/2021, Notice of Entry of Judgment

4/1/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 04/01/2021, Notice of Entry of Judgment

Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims) - Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

4/1/2021: Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims) - Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [OF ONLINE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ODR) MEET AND CONFER]

2/24/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [OF ONLINE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ODR) MEET AND CONFER]

Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims) - Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims)

1/21/2021: Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims) - Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims)

Notice of Rejection - Notice of Rejection

1/21/2021: Notice of Rejection - Notice of Rejection

Notice of Postponement - Notice of Postponement

1/21/2021: Notice of Postponement - Notice of Postponement

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

1/7/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

1/5/2021: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/01/2021
  • DocketAuthorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • DocketCourt orders judgment entered for Plaintiff Shawn Dakhili against Defendant Honda Lease Trust on the Plaintiff's Claim filed by Shawn Dakhili Dakhili on 01/05/2021 for the principal amount of $3,000.00 and costs of $235.00 for a total of $3,235.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • DocketMinute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 04/01/2021, Notice of Entry of Judgment; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • DocketUpdated -- Shawn Dakhili (Plaintiff): First Name changed from Shawn Dakhili to Shawn

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 04/01/2021 at 08:30 AM in Compton Courthouse at Department 7 updated: Result Date to 04/01/2021; Result Type to Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for [OF ONLINE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ODR) MEET AND CONFER]; Issued and Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • DocketOF ONLINE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ODR) MEET AND CONFER; Issued by: Clerk; As to: Shawn Dakhili Dakhili (Plaintiff); Honda Lease Trust (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • DocketRequest to Postpone Trial (Small Claims); Filed by: Honda Lease Trust (Defendant); Has the Claim Been Served?: Yes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • DocketNotice of Postponement; Issued and Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • DocketNotice of Rejection; Filed by: Shawn Dakhili Dakhili (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • DocketPursuant to the request of defendant, Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 02/04/2021 at 10:00 AM in Compton Courthouse at Department 7 Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Party was rescheduled to 04/01/2021 08:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Shawn Dakhili Dakhili (Plaintiff); As to: Honda Lease Trust (Defendant); Service Cost: 160.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 02/04/2021 at 10:00 AM in Compton Courthouse at Department 7

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Victor M. Acevedo in Department 7 Compton Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Shawn Dakhili Dakhili (Plaintiff); As to: Honda Lease Trust (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where HONDA LEASE TRUST is a litigant