This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/26/2022 at 19:38:25 (UTC).

SERVICE MASTER VS UNICE FOKWAH

Case Summary

On 05/28/2021 SERVICE MASTER filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against UNICE FOKWAH. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Compton Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is VICTOR M. ACEVEDO. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0380

  • Filing Date:

    05/28/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

VICTOR M. ACEVEDO

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SERVICE MASTER

Defendant

FOKWAH UNICE

 

Court Documents

Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol - Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol

5/28/2021: Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol - Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

5/28/2021: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Program - Small Claims - Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Meet and Confer - Small Claims

5/28/2021: Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Program - Small Claims - Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Meet and Confer - Small Claims

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

6/2/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Notice of Rejection - Notice of Rejection

6/17/2021: Notice of Rejection - Notice of Rejection

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Notice of Rejection]

6/17/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Notice of Rejection]

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Notice of Rejection]

7/8/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Notice of Rejection]

Notice of Rejection - Notice of Rejection

7/8/2021: Notice of Rejection - Notice of Rejection

Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

7/22/2021: Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 07/22/2021

7/22/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 07/22/2021

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/22/2021
  • DocketOn the Plaintiff's Claim filed by SERVICE MASTER on 05/28/2021, entered Order for Dismissal without prejudice as to the entire action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • DocketMinute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 07/22/2021; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 07/22/2021 at 08:30 AM in Compton Courthouse at Department 7 updated: Result Date to 07/22/2021; Result Type to Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for [Notice of Rejection]; Issued by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • DocketNotice of Rejection; Issued by: Clerk; As to: SERVICE MASTER (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • DocketNotice of Rejection; Issued by: Clerk; As to: SERVICE MASTER (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for [Notice of Rejection]; Issued by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: SERVICE MASTER (Plaintiff); As to: UNICE FOKWAH (Defendant); Service Cost: 40.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: SERVICE MASTER (Plaintiff); As to: UNICE FOKWAH (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • DocketNotice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • DocketNotice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Meet and Confer - Small Claims; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Victor M. Acevedo in Department 7 Compton Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 07/22/2021 at 08:30 AM in Compton Courthouse at Department 7

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Service Master Restoration & Cleaning by Integrity Pacific Building Maintence Inc is a litigant