This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/16/2023 at 21:10:01 (UTC).

SELECTIVE WAY INSURANCE COMPANY, A CORPORATION VS MARIA RAMOS

Case Summary

On 06/01/2022 SELECTIVE WAY INSURANCE COMPANY, A CORPORATION filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against MARIA RAMOS. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MARK E. WINDHAM. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3722

  • Filing Date:

    06/01/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

MARK E. WINDHAM

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SELECTIVE WAY INSURANCE COMPANY A CORPORATION

Defendants

RAMOS MARIA

MDX GLOBAL INC A CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HAINES TODD F.

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

6/1/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Third Amended Standing Order - Third Amended Standing Order

6/1/2022: Third Amended Standing Order - Third Amended Standing Order

General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Interp - General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Inter

6/1/2022: General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Interp - General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Inter

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

6/1/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint - Complaint

6/1/2022: Complaint - Complaint

Summons - Summons on Complaint

6/1/2022: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests - Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests

6/1/2022: Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests - Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests

Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name) - Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

7/13/2022: Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name) - Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

7/6/2022: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

8/4/2022: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Answer - Answer

9/26/2022: Answer - Answer

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

10/4/2022: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/04/2025
  • Hearing06/04/2025 at 08:30 AM in Department 26 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2023
  • Hearing11/29/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 26 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/04/2022
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by: SELECTIVE WAY INSURANCE COMPANY, a corporation (Plaintiff); As to: MDX GLOBAL, INC, a corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/04/2022
  • DocketDefault entered as to MDX GLOBAL, INC, a corporation; On the Complaint filed by SELECTIVE WAY INSURANCE COMPANY, a corporation on 06/01/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/26/2022
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: MARIA RAMOS (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/04/2022
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: SELECTIVE WAY INSURANCE COMPANY, a corporation (Plaintiff); As to: MDX GLOBAL, INC, a corporation (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 08/02/2022; Service Cost: 8.40; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/13/2022
  • DocketAmendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name); Filed by: SELECTIVE WAY INSURANCE COMPANY, a corporation (Plaintiff); As to: MDX GLOBAL, INC, a corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/06/2022
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: SELECTIVE WAY INSURANCE COMPANY, a corporation (Plaintiff); As to: MARIA RAMOS (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 06/18/2022; Service Cost: 80.76; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: SELECTIVE WAY INSURANCE COMPANY, a corporation (Plaintiff); As to: MARIA RAMOS (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Mark E. Windham in Department 26 Spring Street Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: SELECTIVE WAY INSURANCE COMPANY, a corporation (Plaintiff); As to: MARIA RAMOS (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: SELECTIVE WAY INSURANCE COMPANY, a corporation (Plaintiff); As to: MARIA RAMOS (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2022
  • DocketThird Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2022
  • DocketGeneral Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Interpreter Requests; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2022
  • DocketNotice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2022
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 11/29/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 06/04/2025 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Selective Way Insurance Company is a litigant